This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2019 at 07:11:39 (UTC).

Rotor v. Signature Consultants, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Rotor filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Signature Consultants, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-07520

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tanya Rotor

Defendants

Signature Consultants, LLC

Signature Commercial Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 South Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 South Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Farrah Grant

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 South Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Ashley N. Batiste

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 S. Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Thomas Alistair Segal

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 South Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn A Visosky

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard, 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4008

Michael L. Gallion

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd., 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4008

David Van Pelt

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd., 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4008

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

11 #3

Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District

11 #2

Standing Order for Certain Employment Cases

11 #1

Standing Order

#11

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#10

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FURTHER ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL re #5 ORDER; #13 Response filed by Signature Consultants, LLC, Signature Commercial Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 9, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to re #5 Order Re Notice of Removal by Signature Commercial Solutions, LLC, Signature Consultants, LLC. (Van Pelt, David) (Filed on 1/4/2019) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Chaim Shaun Setareh of Ashley N. Batiste (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 1/4/2019) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due 3/25/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for Certain Employment Cases, #3 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case REASSIGNED to Judge Jon S. Tigar. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Docket(#9) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Signature Commercial Solutions, LLC, Signature Consultants, LLC // Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Visosky, Kathryn) (Filed on 12/28/2018) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tanya Rotor.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 12/28/2018) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants' responses due by 1/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/21/2018. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/ 12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Signature Commercial Solutions, LLC, Signature Consultants, LLC (Visosky, Kathryn) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is MCC 18CV336509, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12927329). Filed by Signature Commercial Solutions, LLC & Signature Consultants, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Visosky, Kathryn) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Signature Commercial Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Signature Consultants LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley N. Batiste

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Farrah Grant