This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2019 at 07:11:44 (UTC).

Rotor v. Signature Consultants, LLC., a Florida Limited Liability Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Rotor filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Signature Consultants, LLC , a Florida Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan van Keulen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-07526

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tanya Rotor

Defendants

Signature Consultants, LLC., a Florida Limited Liability Company

Signature Commercial Solutions, LLC, A Florida Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 South Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Farrah Grant

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 S. Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Thomas Alistair Segal

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 S Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorney

Kathryn A Visosky

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard, 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Chaim Shaun Setareh Ashley N. Batiste (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 1/4/2019) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Judge Susan van Keulen. The Court ORDERS Michael Gallion or David Van Pelt to file a Notice of Substitution of Counsel pursuant to Civil Local Rule 5-1(c)(2) by January 7, 2019.(djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Signature Commercial Solutions, LLC, A Florida Limited Liability Company, Signature Consultants, LLC., a Florida Limited Liability Company. Responses due by 1/11/2019. Replies due by 1/18/2019. (Visosky, Kathryn) (Filed on 12/28/2018) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Docket(#1) Answer to Removal Complaint bySignature Commercial Solutions, LLC, A Florida Limited Liability Company, Signature Consultants, LLC., a Florida Limited Liability Company. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Signature Commercial Solutions, LLC, A Florida Limited Liability Company, Signature Consultants, LLC., a Florida Limited Liability Company re 1 Notice of Removal, (Visosky, Kathryn) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara. Their case number is 18CV336219. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12927486). Filed bySignature Commercial Solutions, LLC, A Florida Limited Liability Company, Signature Consultants, LLC., a Florida Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Visosky, Kathryn) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Signature Commercial Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Signature Consultants LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Farrah Grant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Alistair Segal