This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2018 at 16:41:43 (UTC).

Roto-Mix, LLC v. Sioux Automation Center, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2017 Roto-Mix, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Sioux Automation Center, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are CJ Williams and Linda R Reade. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:17-CV-04068

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CJ Williams

Presiding Judge

Linda R Reade

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roto-Mix, LLC

Roto-Mix LLC

Defendants

Sioux Automation Center, Inc.

Sioux Automation Center, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon W Clark

Attorney at McKee Voorhees & Sease PLC

801 Grand Avenue, Suite 3200, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

Christine Lebron-Dykeman

Attorney at McKee Voorhees & Sease PLC

801 Grand Avenue, Suite 3200, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Jonathan Lee Kennedy

Attorney at McKee, Voorhees & Sease, PLC

801 Grand Ave., Suite 3200, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

R Scott Johnson

Attorney at McKee Voorhees & Sease PLC

801 Grand Avenue, Suite 3200, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Defendant Attorneys

Deborah M Tharnish

Attorney at Davis Brown Koehn Shors & Roberts

215 - 10Th Street, Suite 1300, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

Matthew William Coryell

Attorney at Davis Brown Koehn Shors & Roberts PC

215 10Th Street, Suite 1300, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

Michael C Richards

Attorney at Davis Brown Koehn Shors & Roberts PC

215 10Th Street, Suite 1300, Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

New Civil Case Packet

#2

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Document w/copy of Complaint and Stipulation of Dismissal mailed to Register of Copyrights) (mml) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Document w/copy of Complaint and Stipulation of Dismissal mailed to US Patent and Trademark Office) (mml) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #11 Stipulation of Dismissal. (mml) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and without Costs by Roto-Mix LLC (Johnson, R) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Sioux Automation Center, Inc (Richards, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketSet Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 01/25/2018 (kfs) (Entered: 12/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Sioux Automation Center, Inc.(Richards, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roto-Mix LLC. Sioux Automation Center, Inc served on 12/6/2017, answer due 12/27/2017. (Johnson, R) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (DOCKETED IN ERROR) SEALED Motion for Overlength SEALED Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Roto-Mix LLC, Defendant Sioux Automation Center, Inc (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Appendix Part 1, #4 Appendix Part 2, #5 Appendix Part 3, #6 Appendix Part 4, #7 Appendix Part 5, #8 Appendix Part 6) (Johnson, R) Modified on 12/5/2017 to edit text (mml). Modified on 12/5/2017 to add text docketed in error per phone call from attorney's office (mml). (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (DOCKETED IN ERROR) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Roto-Mix LLC Responses due by 12/26/2017 (Johnson, R) Modified on 12/5/2017 to added docketed in error per phone call from attorney's office (mml). (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Roto-Mix LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dyson, Dyson & Dunn, Inc. for Roto-Mix LLC. (Johnson, R) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Document w/copy of Complaint mailed to Register of Copyrights.) (mml) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Document w/copy of Complaint mailed to US Patent and Trademark Office.) (mml) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Sioux Automation Center, Inc.. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mml) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketJudge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams added. No conflicts identified as to parties, attorneys, LRR, and CJW. (mml) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand False Designation of Origin, Copyright Infringement, Common Law Trademark Infringement and Unfair Competition against Sioux Automation Center, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2590330.), filed by Roto-Mix, LLC. Scheduling Report Deadline 3/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Johnson, R) Modified on 11/21/2017 to edit text (mml) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2017: #6 Cover Sheet) (mml). (Entered: 11/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roto-Mix, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Christopher Richards