This case was last updated from PACER on 02/23/2018 at 05:58:40 (UTC).

Ross v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2018 Ross filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00150

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory Ross

Defendants

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

McKesson Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neil D. Overholtz

Attorney at Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz

17 East Main Street, Suite 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Ephraim Samuel Geisler

Attorney at Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz

17 East Main Street, Suite 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Renee Chabert Crasto

Attorney at Walters, Papillion, Thomas, Cullens, LLC

12345 Perkins Road, Building 2, Suite 202

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Darrel James Papillion

Attorney at Walters, Papillion, Thomas, Cullens, LLC

12345 Perkins Road, Building 2, Suite 202

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Bryan F. Aylstock

Attorney at Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz

17 East Main Street, Suite 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Defendant Attorneys

Lawton Cole Callihan

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP - New Orleans

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

Diana Cole Surprenant

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP - New Orleans

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

William Edward Steimle

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP - CA

101 Second Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr.

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP - CA

101 Second Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

E. Paige Sensenbrenner

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP - New Orleans

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#50

(#50) AMENDED ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS IN ALL MEMBER CASES: In order to clarify the stipulated order to stay proceedings tendered by the parties and entered by the Court ( #8 in 5:18-md-2809, et al), the Court hereby ORDERS that the joint motion to stay deadlines ( #6 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) filed by the parties is GRANTED and all deadlines in all pending member cases, other than the deadlines set forth in the Court's Order Regarding Practice and Procedure ( #3 in 5:18-md-2809), are stayed pending further orders of the Court. All deadlines set forth in the Order Regarding Practice and Procedure ( #3 in 5:18-md-2809) remain in effect. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/22/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 02/22/2018)

48 #1

*Restricted*

#48

(#48) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:17-cv-00443. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/22/2018)

47 #1

Transmittal letter

#47

(#47) Order of MDL Transfer to Eastern District of Kentucky. MDL case number is 2809. Electronic file sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal letter)(lag) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

#46

(#46) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2809. (lag) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

45 #2

Schedule of Actions

45 #1

Memorandum in Support

#45

(#45) MOTION before the JPML for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings filed by Moving Plaintiff Carolyn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions)(bwn) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee previously paid) by Gregory Ross. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Papillion, Darrel) Modified on 4/13/2017 (clc). [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 04/13/2017)

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(clc) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 04/10/2017)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#50) AMENDED ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS IN ALL MEMBER CASES: In order to clarify the stipulated order to stay proceedings tendered by the parties and entered by the Court ( #8 in 5:18-md-2809, et al), the Court hereby ORDERS that the joint motion to stay deadlines ( #6 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) filed by the parties is GRANTED and all deadlines in all pending member cases, other than the deadlines set forth in the Court's Order Regarding Practice and Procedure ( #3 in 5:18-md-2809), are stayed pending further orders of the Court. All deadlines set forth in the Order Regarding Practice and Procedure ( #3 in 5:18-md-2809) remain in effect. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/22/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 02/22/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5922879) filed by Gregory Ross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Darrel James Papillion added to party Gregory Ross(pty:pla).(Papillion, Darrel) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2017)

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) AMENDED ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS IN ALL MEMBER CASES: In order to clarify the stipulated order to stay proceedings tendered by the parties and entered by the Court ( #8 in 5:18-md-2809, et al), the Court hereby ORDERS that the joint motion to stay deadlines ( #6 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) filed by the parties is GRANTED and all deadlines in all pending member cases, other than the deadlines set forth in the Court's Order Regarding Practice and Procedure ( #3 in 5:18-md-2809), are stayed pending further orders of the Court. All deadlines set forth in the Order Regarding Practice and Procedure ( #3 in 5:18-md-2809) remain in effect. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/22/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (CBD) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:17-cv-00443. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Order of MDL Transfer to Eastern District of Kentucky. MDL case number is 2809. Electronic file sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal letter)(lag) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2809. (lag) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MOTION before the JPML for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings filed by Moving Plaintiff Carolyn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions)(bwn) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Notice of Related Case(s) by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation of related case(s) 17-7884. (Callihan, Lawton) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 10/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER granting #42 Motion for Change in Designation of Trial Attorney. Neil D. Overholtz is hereby designated as trial attorney. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/2/2017. (clc) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Change in Designation of Trial Attorney by Gregory Ross. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Papillion, Darrel) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 09/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee previously paid) by Gregory Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Papillion, Darrel) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 04/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed; McKesson Corporation served on 4/14/2017, answer due 5/5/2017. (Papillion, Darrel) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 4/14/2017, answer due 5/5/2017. (Papillion, Darrel) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP served on 4/14/2017, answer due 5/5/2017. (Papillion, Darrel) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SHOW CAUSE ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff show good cause in writing within twenty days why service of process has not been effected, or the unserved defendant will be dismissed without notice. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/25/2017.(clc) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee previously paid) by Gregory Ross. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Papillion, Darrel) Modified on 4/13/2017 (clc). [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 04/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(clc) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 04/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-5942614) by Gregory Ross. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Papillion, Darrel) Modified on 1/31/2017 (cg). [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 01/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (jeg) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5922879) filed by Gregory Ross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Darrel James Papillion added to party Gregory Ross(pty:pla).(Papillion, Darrel) [Transferred from laed on 2/22/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less