This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2018 at 07:07:05 (UTC).

Rosas v. Advocate Christ Medical Center et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 Rosas filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Advocate Christ Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05340

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria M. Rosas

Chicago, IL 60638

Defendants

MacNeal Hospital

Advocate Christ Medical Center

Madden Mental Health Center

Chicago Police Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Michael Charles Stephenson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

100 W. Randolph St., 13 Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chicago Police Department on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (aee, ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

18 #1

Certificate of Service

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Charles Stephenson for presentment of motion to strike #17 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/17/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

17 #1

Certificate of Service

#17

(#17) MOTION by Defendant Madden Mental Health Center to strike amended complaint #15 and extension of time to respond under Rule 6 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

16 #1

Certificate of Service

#16

(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Madden Mental Health Center by Michael Charles Stephenson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#15

(#15) SECOND AMENDED complaint by Maria M. Rosas against All Defendants. (aee, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#14

(#14) ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed as to MacNeal Hospital on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (aee, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#10

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The order to show cause #9 is discharged because the amended complaint #10 makes clear that Plaintiff intends to pursue federal claims against Defendants. However, it does not appear from the docket that summonses have been served. The status hearing set for 9/24/2018 #9 is stricken and re-set for 10/22/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff is reminded of the requirements and procedures of Civil Rule 4(m). Failure to timely comply with or seek relief under Civil Rule 4(m) will result in the dismissal without prejudice of this suit. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#9

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The order to show cause #9 is discharged because the amended complaint #10 makes clear that Plaintiff intends to pursue federal claims against Defendants. However, it does not appear from the docket that summonses have been served. The status hearing set for 9/24/2018 #9 is stricken and re-set for 10/22/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff is reminded of the requirements and procedures of Civil Rule 4(m). Failure to timely comply with or seek relief under Civil Rule 4(m) will result in the dismissal without prejudice of this suit. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 denied in light of Plaintiff's paying the filing fee 6 . Motion for attorney representation #5 is denied because Plaintiff has not demonstrated that she is unable to afford counsel, and also because Plaintiff has not shown that she has made sufficient efforts to find counsel on her own. Summonses have issued, and it is Plaintiff's obligation to ensure that summonses are served. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Also, Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing by 9/5/2018 why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, without prejudice to Plaintiff re-filing the case in state court. The counts against all three defendants (Doc. 1 at pp. 12-14) allege only negligence, which is a state law claim, and because there is no diversity of citizenship, such claims can be brought only in state court. The complaint cites federal statutes, but it would appear from the counts that Plaintiff intends to bring only negligence claims. Failure to show good cause by 9/5/2018 will result in the dismissal on jurisdictional grounds of this suit. Status hearing set for 9/24/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#4

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 denied in light of Plaintiff's paying the filing fee 6 . Motion for attorney representation #5 is denied because Plaintiff has not demonstrated that she is unable to afford counsel, and also because Plaintiff has not shown that she has made sufficient efforts to find counsel on her own. Summonses have issued, and it is Plaintiff's obligation to ensure that summonses are served. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Also, Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing by 9/5/2018 why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, without prejudice to Plaintiff re-filing the case in state court. The counts against all three defendants (Doc. 1 at pp. 12-14) allege only negligence, which is a state law claim, and because there is no diversity of citizenship, such claims can be brought only in state court. The complaint cites federal statutes, but it would appear from the counts that Plaintiff intends to bring only negligence claims. Failure to show good cause by 9/5/2018 will result in the dismissal on jurisdictional grounds of this suit. Status hearing set for 9/24/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#3

(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Maria M. Rosas (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and No copies filed by Maria M. Rosas (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chicago Police Department on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (aee, ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Charles Stephenson for presentment of motion to strike #17 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/17/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION by Defendant Madden Mental Health Center to strike amended complaint #15 and extension of time to respond under Rule 6 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Madden Mental Health Center by Michael Charles Stephenson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Chicago Police Department. (aee, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SECOND AMENDED complaint by Maria M. Rosas against All Defendants. (aee, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed as to MacNeal Hospital on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (aee, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Madden Mental Health Center on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (aee, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Advocate Christ Medical Center on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (aee, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The order to show cause #9 is discharged because the amended complaint #10 makes clear that Plaintiff intends to pursue federal claims against Defendants. However, it does not appear from the docket that summonses have been served. The status hearing set for 9/24/2018 #9 is stricken and re-set for 10/22/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff is reminded of the requirements and procedures of Civil Rule 4(m). Failure to timely comply with or seek relief under Civil Rule 4(m) will result in the dismissal without prejudice of this suit. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FIRST AMENDED complaint by Maria M. Rosas (bg, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Advocate Christ Medical Center, MacNeal Hospital, Madden Mental Health Center. (kb, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 denied in light of Plaintiff's paying the filing fee 6 . Motion for attorney representation #5 is denied because Plaintiff has not demonstrated that she is unable to afford counsel, and also because Plaintiff has not shown that she has made sufficient efforts to find counsel on her own. Summonses have issued, and it is Plaintiff's obligation to ensure that summonses are served. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Also, Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing by 9/5/2018 why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, without prejudice to Plaintiff re-filing the case in state court. The counts against all three defendants (Doc. 1 at pp. 12-14) allege only negligence, which is a state law claim, and because there is no diversity of citizenship, such claims can be brought only in state court. The complaint cites federal statutes, but it would appear from the counts that Plaintiff intends to bring only negligence claims. Failure to show good cause by 9/5/2018 will result in the dismissal on jurisdictional grounds of this suit. Status hearing set for 9/24/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Advocate Christ Medical Center, MacNeal Hospital, and Madden Mental Health Center (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Maria M. Rosas for attorney representation (Exhibit) (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Maria M. Rosas for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Maria M. Rosas (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and No copies filed by Maria M. Rosas (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advocate Christ Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Chicago Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Charles Stephenson