This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2019 at 07:33:10 (UTC).

Rosario v. Texas Veterans Commission

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Rosario filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Texas Veterans Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01008

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin Rosario

Defendant

Texas Veterans Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David K. Sergi

Attorney at David K. Sergi & Associates, P.C.

329 S. Guadalupe, P.O. Box 887 (Zip 78667-0887)

San Marcos, TX 78666

Defendant Attorney

Cristina M. Moreno

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

Po Box 12548 Capital Station

Austin, TX 78711

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Texas Veterans Commission. (Moreno, Cristina) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Texas Veterans Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moreno, Cristina) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Rosario. Texas Veterans Commission served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Sergi, David) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Rosario. Benjamin Rosario served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Sergi, David) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Texas Veterans Commission. (afd) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons in a Civil Action by Benjamin Rosario. (Sergi, David) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/27/2018 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

1 #2

Affidavit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11488064), filed by Benjamin Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Sergi, David) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Texas Veterans Commission. (Moreno, Cristina) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Texas Veterans Commission answer due 1/18/2019. (td) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or to otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and includes January 18, 2019.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Texas Veterans Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moreno, Cristina) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Rosario. Texas Veterans Commission served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Sergi, David) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Rosario. Benjamin Rosario served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Sergi, David) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Texas Veterans Commission. (afd) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Benjamin Rosario. (afd) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons in a Civil Action by Benjamin Rosario. (Sergi, David) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/27/2018 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11488064), filed by Benjamin Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Sergi, David) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David K Sergi(Designation Retained)