This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2018 at 11:25:46 (UTC).

Roper et al v. BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2016 Roper filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Zilly. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-01453

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Zilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Roper

Carol Roper

Defendants

Thomas Dee Engineering Co Inc

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Schneider Electric USA, Inc

Crane Co.

Goulds Pumps, Inc

J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc

Thorpe Insulation Co

General Electric Company

SB Decking, Inc

Brand Insulations, Inc

Cleaver-Brooks, Inc

Lone Star Industries, Inc

Zurn Industries LLC

Grinnell LLC

Saberhagen Holdings, Inc

ITT Corporation

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael David Myers(Designation Retained)

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron P Riensche(Designation Retained)

Kevin J Craig

Mark B Tuvim(Designation Retained)

Rachel Tallon Reynolds(Designation Retained)

Ryan J Groshong(Designation Retained)

G William Shaw(Designation Retained)

Michael Mackenzie Brown(Designation Retained)

Christopher S Marks(Designation Retained)

Barry Neal Mesher(Designation Retained)

Brian D Zeringer(Designation Retained)

Malika Johnson

Timothy Kost Thorson(Designation Retained)

Howard (Terry) I. Hall(Designation Retained)

Jason H Daywitt

John Michael Mattingly(Designation Retained)

Ronald C Gardner

Richard G Gawlowski(Designation Retained)

Other Attorneys

T Arlen Rumsey(Designation Retained)

Michael Edward Ricketts(Designation Retained)

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#79

#92

#98

#100

#102

#104

#108

#110

#121

#134

#139

#145

#147

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) MINUTE ORDER striking as moot parties' 146 Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. AUthorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#139) MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 135 Motion to Amend the Complaint and to Substitute Party to Continue the Action for Deceased Plaintiff Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. Rule 15(a)(2) and Rule 25(a)(1). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(a), Carol Roper is hereby substituted for deceased plaintiff William Roper as the Personal Representative of his Estate. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Lone Star Industries, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) ORDER to Continue the Expert Disclosure Deadline re parties' 114 ; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) deadline EXTENDED to 8/14/2017, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 9/5/2017, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant BorgWarner Morse Tec, Inc. re parties' 109 Stipulation ; plaintiffs' claims against BorgWarner are dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to either party, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (BorgWarner Morse Tec, Inc terminated.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Saberhagen Holdings, Inc. re parties' 107 Stipulation; plaintiffs' claims in this matter against specially-appearing defendant Saberhagen Holdings, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party, reserving to plaintiffs their claims against all other parties, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)(Saberhagen Holdings, Inc. terminated.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 103 Stipulated Motion ; striking defendant Metalclad Insulation's 93 Motion for Summary Judgment ; Plaintiffs' claims against defendant Metalclad Insulation, LLC are dismissed with prejudice, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Metalclad Insulation, LLC terminated)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) STIPULATION AND ORDER for dismissal of Thomas Dee Engineering Co. Inc; re parties' 101 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Thomas Dee Engineering Co Inc terminated)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. re parties' 96 Stipulation; Plaintiffs' claims in this matter against Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party, reserving to Plaintiffs their claims against all other parties, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. terminated)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC re parties' 95 Stipulation ; All claims against Defendant ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC are hereby dismissed without prejudice, and without costs to either party, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (Zurn Industries LLC terminated.) (SWT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 89 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.; Plaintiffs' claims against defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice, reserving to plaintiffs their claims against all other parties, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc terminated.)(SWT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly dismissing without prejudice Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant ITT LLC, f/k/a ITT Corporation. (PM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less