This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2018 at 07:16:27 (UTC).

Roness v. T-Mobile USA, Inc

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 Roness filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against T-Mobile USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01030

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arthur Roness

Defendants

T-Mobile USA Inc

T-Mobile USA, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick J Kang

Attorney at PREMIER LAW GROUP

1408 140Th Place Ne

Bellevue, WA 98007

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew R Kelly

Attorney at SEBRIS BUSTO JAMES

14205 Se 36Th St, Ste 325

Bellevue, WA 98006

Jeffrey A James

Attorney at SEBRIS BUSTO JAMES

14205 Se 36Th St, Ste 325

Bellevue, WA 98006

 

Court Documents

16 #7

Exhibit G

16 #6

Exhibit F

16 #5

Exhibit E

16 #4

Exhibit D

16 #3

Exhibit C

16 #2

Exhibit B

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#16) DECLARATION of Arthur Roness filed by Plaintiff Arthur Roness re #14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

15 #2

Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

(#15) DECLARATION of Patrick J. Kang filed by Plaintiff Arthur Roness re #14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Arthur Roness. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/10/2018, (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *5-7 days*. Jury Trial is set for 10/28/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 10/2/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 10/2/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/1/2019, Motions due by 5/31/2019, Discovery completed by 7/1/2019, Dispositive motions due by 7/30/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/13/2019, Motions in Limine due by 9/30/2019, Pretrial Order due by 10/16/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/23/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/23/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#12

(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5-7. (James, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. Cc to RSM. (KMP) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint; by T-Mobile USA, Inc.(James, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Jeffrey A James for Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc from August 13-27; September 3 through October 5. (James, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DECLARATION of Arthur Roness filed by Plaintiff Arthur Roness re #14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DECLARATION of Patrick J. Kang filed by Plaintiff Arthur Roness re #14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Arthur Roness. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/10/2018, (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *5-7 days*. Jury Trial is set for 10/28/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 10/2/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 10/2/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/1/2019, Motions due by 5/31/2019, Discovery completed by 7/1/2019, Dispositive motions due by 7/30/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/13/2019, Motions in Limine due by 9/30/2019, Pretrial Order due by 10/16/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/23/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/23/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5-7. (James, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. Cc to RSM. (KMP) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint; by T-Mobile USA, Inc.(James, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Jeffrey A James for Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc from August 13-27; September 3 through October 5. (James, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Arthur Roness (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/14/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/21/2018, by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (TF) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #6 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (TF) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 8/28/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (DJ) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement : Modified on 7/17/2018 to identify corporate parent information. (KB) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record (not contemporaneously filed with Notice of Removal))(James, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parents/Other Affiliates T-Mobile USA, Inc. a Delaware corporation T-Mobile US, Inc, T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V., and Deutsche Telekom AG for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (James, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/17/2018 to identify corporate parent information (KB). (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (James, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior, case number 18-2-14901-1; (Receipt # 0981-5394192), filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit-Summons, #3 Exhibit-King Co. Records)(James, Jeffrey). Modified on 7/16/2018 (DJ). (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick J Kang