This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2018 at 07:10:33 (UTC).

Romero v. Godinez et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 Romero filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Godinez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02044

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francisco Romero

Menard, IL 62259

Defendants

Lt Davis

David Gomez

Michael Lemke

Counselor Guth

Lt. Elberson

Richard Harrington

Marcus Hardy

John/Jane Doe

Michael Magana

Salvador Godinez

Assistant Warden Shull

Jerry Baldwin

Ricardo Tejeda

Assistant Wardens of Programs

Counselor Eilts

Assistant Warden of Operations during Reviews

Guy Pierce, Sr.

Warden Randy Pfister

Michael Atchison

3 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Francisco Romero. (jaj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 18-cv-2044-NJR. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerks Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/1/2018. (jsm2) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-06671. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#6

(#6) TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Illinois, East St. Louis Division the electronic record. (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/18/2018: The Court transfers this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, East St. Louis Division, for imposition of an initial filing fee and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The Clerk shall not issue summonses unless the transferee court so directs. All pending motions #3 #4 are terminated on this Court's docket. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Francisco Romero for appointment of counsel. (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Francisco Romero for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; Exhibit. (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Francisco Romero; Exhibits. (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #3 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $25.34. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid. In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Menard Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/9/2018. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Francisco Romero. (jaj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 18-cv-2044-NJR. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerks Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/1/2018. (jsm2) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-06671. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Illinois, East St. Louis Division the electronic record. (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/18/2018: The Court transfers this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, East St. Louis Division, for imposition of an initial filing fee and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The Clerk shall not issue summonses unless the transferee court so directs. All pending motions #3 #4 are terminated on this Court's docket. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Francisco Romero for appointment of counsel. (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Francisco Romero for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; Exhibit. (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Francisco Romero; Exhibits. (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less