Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2018 at 07:28:52 (UTC).

Rollins v. Institutions of Life

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 Rollins filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Institutions of Life. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine D. Perry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01607

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine D. Perry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Jean Rollins

Albuqurque, NM 87109

Defendant

Institutions of Life

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER of USCA as to #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Karen Jean Rollins. If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a) (2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, CDs, videos, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. USCA Appeal #: 18-3330. (EAB) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER of USCA as to #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Karen Jean Rollins. The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by November 28, 2018, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. USCA Appeal #: 18-3330. (EAB) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#14

(#14) Initial Notification from USCA for #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Karen Jean Rollins. USCA Appeal Number: 18-3330.(EAB) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #9 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal), #8 Memorandum & Order,,. Notice of Appeal filed on 10/29/18 by Plaintiff Karen Jean Rollins. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(JWD) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal), #8 Memorandum & Order by Plaintiff Karen Jean Rollins. (EAB) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#11

(#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Karen Rollins. Returned document(s): #9 Order of Dismissal, #8 Memorandum & Order. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (The docket sheet does note that she has an email address.) (MCB) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#10

(#10) Letter to Clerk of Court from Karen Rollins re:adjustment to link documents. (MCB) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/15/18. (EAB) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [ECF No. #2 ]IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as the complaint is legally frivolous. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED as moot. [ECF No. #4 ] A separate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/15/18. (EAB) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #7

Envelope

1 #6

Original Filing Form

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet - unsigned by plaintiff

1 #4

Exhibit - Emails

1 #3

Exhibit - UMSL Application

1 #2

Exhibit - Passport Card (Clerk's note: document sealed pursuant to Local R

1 #1

Correspondence

#1

(#7) SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Karen Jean Rollins. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(MCB) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER of USCA as to #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Karen Jean Rollins. If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a) (2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, CDs, videos, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. USCA Appeal #: 18-3330. (EAB) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER of USCA as to #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Karen Jean Rollins. The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by November 28, 2018, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. USCA Appeal #: 18-3330. (EAB) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Initial Notification from USCA for #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Karen Jean Rollins. USCA Appeal Number: 18-3330.(EAB) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #9 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal), #8 Memorandum & Order,,. Notice of Appeal filed on 10/29/18 by Plaintiff Karen Jean Rollins. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(JWD) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal), #8 Memorandum & Order by Plaintiff Karen Jean Rollins. (EAB) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Karen Rollins. Returned document(s): #9 Order of Dismissal, #8 Memorandum & Order. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (The docket sheet does note that she has an email address.) (MCB) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter to Clerk of Court from Karen Rollins re:adjustment to link documents. (MCB) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8, 9. copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Tue Oct 16 12:03:29 CDT 2018 (Brown, Erica) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/15/18. (EAB) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [ECF No. #2 ]IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as the complaint is legally frivolous. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED as moot. [ECF No. #4 ] A separate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/15/18. (EAB) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Karen Jean Rollins. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(MCB) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Karen Jean Rollins. (MCB) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Sep 21 17:01:51 CDT 2018 (admin,) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (JWD) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter to plaintiff Karen Jean Rollins from Chief Deputy Clerk. Re: This letter is to serve as notification of your recent filings in the Eastern District of Missouri. The Complaint, Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Financial Affidavit, and Motion for Appointment of Counsel have been assigned a case number, scanned, and filed in the Court's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing System (CM/ECF). However, the other items in the box, including binders, tax returns, torn pieces of note paper, notebooks, and other fragments of paper are being maintained in paper format in the Clerk's Office as the condition of the documents would not allow scanning, while maintaining the integrity of the original. The box of items cannot be returned to you as you have requested in your correspondence to the Clerk; however, if you wish to retrieve the box in person you may do so at the Clerk's Office. Please do not hesitate to contact this office if you have any questions. [Documents maintained in the Clerk's Office in paper format.] (JWD) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Karen Jean Rollins. (JWD) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Karen Jean Rollins. (JWD) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Karen Jean Rollins. (JWD) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Institutions of Life, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Karen Jean Rollins. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 Exhibit - Passport Card (Clerk's note: document sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers), #3 Exhibit - UMSL Application, #4 Exhibit - Emails, #5 Civil Cover Sheet - unsigned by plaintiff, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Envelope) (JWD). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less