This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2018 at 07:28:43 (UTC).

Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. v. Multicut North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2018 Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Multicut North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stefan R. Underhill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01212

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stefan R. Underhill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.

Defendant

Multicut North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew C. Brown

Attorney at Wiggin & Dana-NH

One Century Tower, 265 Church Street P.O. Box 1832

New Haven, CT 06508-1832

Lorey Rives Leddy

Attorney at Murtha Cullina, LLP - Stmfd

177 Broad Street, 4Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901

David Paul Friedman

Attorney at Murtha Cullina, LLP - Stmfd

177 Broad Street, 4Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901

Richard J Basile

Attorney at Murtha Cullina LLP

177 Broad Street

Stamford, CT 06901

Defendant Attorney

David A. Slossberg

Attorney at Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

147 North Broad St.

Milford, CT 06460-0112

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/23/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/23/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/23/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2018. Discovery due by 1/22/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Multicut North America, Inc. from CT Superior Court, case number AAN-CV18-5015713-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4909830, filed by Multicut North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Slossberg, David) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/23/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/23/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/23/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2018. Discovery due by 1/22/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Multicut North America, Inc. from CT Superior Court, case number AAN-CV18-5015713-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4909830, filed by Multicut North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Slossberg, David) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Slossberg