This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2018 at 06:34:30 (UTC).

Rok vs. Identiv, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 Rok filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Identiv, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-05775

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Likar Rok

Petitioners

Michael Garsva

Ronald Manzani

Jerome Davis

Ryan Oswald

Thomas Cunningham

John Gaddum

Defendants

Gary Kremen

Steven Humphreys

Jason Hart

Daniel Wenzel

Brian Nelson

Identiv, Inc.

James E. Ousley

Steven Finney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

Phong L. Tran

Attorney at Johnson Fistel, LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

Robert Vincent Prongay

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Frank James Johnson

655 West Broadway, Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

Mark Punzalan

Attorney at Chan Punzalan LLP

2000 Alameda De Las Pulgas, Suite 154

San Mateo, CA 94403

Charles Henry Linehan

Attorney at Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Adam Christopher McCall

Attorney at LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP

445 S. Figueroa St., 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jennifer Pafiti

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

468 North Camden Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Willem F. Jonckheer

Attorney at Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, Suite 1650

San Francisco, CA 94111

Lesley F Portnoy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Casey Edwards Sadler

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jason Lee Krajcer

Attorney at Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Shawn Eric Fields

Attorney at Johnson and Weaver, LLP

600 West Broadway, Suite 1540

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

James M. Lindfelt

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

2550 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1115

Michael Todd Scott

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

The Orrick Building, 405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94115

Robert P. Varian

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Vikram S. Shah

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Sara B. Brody

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 Califonia Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Nicole Marie Ryan

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Raymond Winters Stockstill, IV

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

695 Town Center Drive, Seventeenth Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Edward Han

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

55 Second Street, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#91

#90

#89

#88

80 #3

Exhibit A to Declaration of Phong L. Tran

80 #1

Proposed Order

#80

76 #1

Representation Statement

#76

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

#1

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #90 . (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) MANDATE of USCA as to #76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas Cunningham. The judgment of this Court, entered 3/23/18, takes effect this date.(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) USCA Memorandum as to #76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas Cunningham. The decision of the district court is affirmed. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018) (Entered: 03/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer re #80 Rule 60(b) Motion. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) NOTICE by Thomas Cunningham re #80 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) of Supplemental Authority in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion)(Tran, Phong) (Filed on 2/2/2018) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) REPLY (re #80 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) ) filed byThomas Cunningham. (Tran, Phong) (Filed on 1/24/2018) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) ) filed byBrian Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brody, Sara) (Filed on 1/17/2018) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) Joinder re #83 Opposition/Response to Motion for Relief by Jason Hart. (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 1/17/2018) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) ) filed byIdentiv, Inc.. (McGrath, Christopher) (Filed on 1/17/2018) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #80 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b). Responses due by 1/17/2018. Replies due by 1/24/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Michael Garsva. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d), #3 Exhibit Certification, #4 Exhibit Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit Notice, #6 Exhibit Firm Resume, #7 Proposed Order)(McCall, Adam) (Filed on 2/5/2016) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Ryan Oswald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 2/4/2016) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #7 Stipulation deferring responses to complaint pending appointment of lead plaintiff and designation of operative complaint. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Deferring Responses to Complaint Pending Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Designation of Operative Complaint filed by Steven Finney, Jason Hart, Steven Humphreys, Identiv, Inc., Gary Kremen, Brian Nelson, James E. Ousley, Daniel Wenzel. (Lindfelt, James) (Filed on 1/25/2016) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Steven Finney, Jason Hart, Steven Humphreys, Identiv, Inc., Gary Kremen, Brian Nelson, James E. Ousley, Daniel Wenzel. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • (#4) Case assigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Punzalan, Mark) (Filed on 12/16/2015) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Likar Rok . (Punzalan, Mark) (Filed on 12/16/2015) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10070687.). Filed byLikar Rok. (Punzalan, Mark) (Filed on 12/16/2015) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phong L. Tran

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Punzalan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank J. Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert V Prongay