This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2018 at 07:01:45 (UTC).

Rojas et al v. Bosch Solar Energy Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Rojas filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Bosch Solar Energy Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-05841

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrea N. Rojas

Steve R. Rojas

Defendant

Bosch Solar Energy Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Michael Birka-White

Attorney at Birka-White Law Offices

178 E. Prospect Avenue

Danville, CA 94526

Steven Todd Knuppel

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven T. Knuppel

178 E. Prospect Avenue

Danville, CA 94526

John D Green

Attorney at Farella Braun + Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph C. Wylie, II

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

70 West Madison, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Matthew Gordon Ball

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

John William Edward Rotunno

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

70 West Madison, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#16

#14

#13

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • (#24) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bosch Solar Energy Corporation.. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 11/19/2018) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Proposed Order re #21 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Bosch Solar Energy Corporation. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 11/19/2018) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Bosch Solar Energy Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2019 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 12/3/2018. Replies due by 12/10/2018. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 11/19/2018) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Wylie, II (Wylie, Joseph) (Filed on 11/19/2018) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by John William Edward Rotunno (Rotunno, John) (Filed on 11/19/2018) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bosch Solar Energy Corporation. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 11/19/2018) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • (#17) CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/3/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Joseph C. Wylie II Pro Hac Vice representing Bosch Solar Energy Corporation #14 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney John W. Rotunno Pro Hac Vice representing Bosch Solar Energy Corporation #13 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Bosch Solar Energy Corporation. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 10/18/2018) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve R. Rojas. Bosch Solar Energy Corporation served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steve R. Rojas.. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/25/2018) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Bosch Solar Energy Corporation. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/26/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (#5) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/9/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Steve R. Rojas and Andrea N. Rojas (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Steve R. Rojas and Andrea N. Rojas. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunction against Bosch Solar Energy Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12702912.). Filed bySteve R. Rojas. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/24/2018) Modified on 10/26/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Gordon Ball

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph C. Wylie, II