This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2019 at 07:20:38 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ v. UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 RODRIGUEZ filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne E. Thompson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-16939

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne E. Thompson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUIS A. RODRIGUEZ

Defendants

JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS 1-100

UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAURO CARLO CASCI

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MAURO C. CASCI

739 Leonardville Road, Po Box 90

Leonardo, NJ 07737

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS D. JACOBSON

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER P.C.

100 Campus Drive, Suite 112

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Letter from Plaintiff requesting adjournment of Scheduling Conference. (CASCI, MAURO) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2019 03:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/12/2018. (mps) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(JACOBSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JACOBSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, case number MON-L-3930-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9223934), filed by UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(JACOBSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Initial Conference scheduled for 3/26/19 with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman has been rescheduled to 4/18/19 at 9:30 a.m. (if, ) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Plaintiff requesting adjournment of Scheduling Conference. (CASCI, MAURO) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2019 03:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/12/2018. (mps) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(JACOBSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JACOBSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, case number MON-L-3930-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9223934), filed by UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(JACOBSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS D. JACOBSON