This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2018 at 07:40:09 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Greco et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Rodriguez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Greco. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew G. Schopler and William Q. Hayes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01875

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrew G. Schopler

Presiding Judge

William Q. Hayes

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gloria Rodriguez

Redwood City, CA 94063

Respondents

County of San Diego

City of San Diego

San Diego DA's Office

Matt Greco

 

Court Documents

13 #1

*Restricted*

#13

(#13) Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:15-cv-04853. Original file received electronically (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF TRANSFER.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/2/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 03/02/2016)

#11

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

9 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Case Management Conference. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#10

(#10) Response to #8 Order to Show Cause filed by Gloria Rodriguez. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2016)

8 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED FOR IMPROPER VENUE. Show Cause Response due by 1/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/22/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gloria Rodriguez. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 12/17/2015)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/16/2015. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. ( (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 12/02/2015)

5 #1

Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/27/2015. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2015)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/05/2015)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order (Mag. Judge Corley), #2 Standing Order (All Judges))(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gloria Rodriguez. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 10/23/2015)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • (#15) NOTICE of Terminated Civil Case (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sjt) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • (#14) Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler assigned to transfer case from Northern District of California. (no document attached) (jpp) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:15-cv-04853. Original file received electronically (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of California. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER OF TRANSFER.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/2/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) EXHIBITS re #10 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Gloria Rodriguez. (Related document(s) #10 ) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Case Management Conference. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Response to #8 Order to Show Cause filed by Gloria Rodriguez. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED FOR IMPROPER VENUE. Show Cause Response due by 1/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/22/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gloria Rodriguez. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/16/2015. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. ( (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 12/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/27/2015. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order (Mag. Judge Corley), #2 Standing Order (All Judges))(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gloria Rodriguez. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against City of San Diego, County of San Diego, Matt Greco, San Diego DA's Office (Filing fee: IFPP). Filed by Gloria Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/10/2018.] (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Diego County Sheriff's Department is a litigant