This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/03/2019 at 08:06:03 (UTC).

Rodriguez, et al v. Mach et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 Rodriguez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Mach. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01265

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GRACIELA RODGRIGUEZ

KHALID SALAHUDDIN

CHARLES STEVENS

NATHAN ALEXANDER

Graciela Rodriguez

Defendants

AMANDA ARRIAGA

STEVEN McCRAW

GREG ABBOTT

SKYLOR HEARN

STEVEN MACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Rolland McGiverin

Attorney at Austin Community Law Center

2221 Hancock Drive

Austin, TX 78756

Marissa K. Hatton

Attorney at Equal Justice Under Law

400 7Th Street Nw, Suite 602

Washington, DC 20004

Phil Telfeyan

Attorney at Equal Justice Under Law

400 7Th Street Nw, Suite 602

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Khalid Salahuddin, Charles Stevens, Nathan Alexander, Graciela Rodriguez as to All Defendants. (Hatton, Marissa) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Rolland McGiverin for Phil Telfeyan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11535515) by on behalf of NATHAN ALEXANDER, GRACIELA RODGRIGUEZ, KHALID SALAHUDDIN, CHARLES STEVENS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGiverin, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#3

(#3) Letter to attorney Marissa K. Hatton regarding attorney admission to the Western District of Texas. (bc) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#2

(#2) Letter to attorney Phil Telfeyan regarding atorney admission to the Western District of Texas. (bc) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11521456). No Summons requested at this time, filed by KHALID SALAHUDDIN, CHARLES STEVENS, NATHAN ALEXANDER, GRACIELA RODGRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(McGiverin, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Khalid Salahuddin, Charles Stevens, Nathan Alexander, Graciela Rodriguez as to All Defendants. (Hatton, Marissa) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (md) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (md) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Rolland McGiverin for Marissa Hatton ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11535550) by on behalf of NATHAN ALEXANDER, GRACIELA RODGRIGUEZ, KHALID SALAHUDDIN, CHARLES STEVENS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGiverin, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Rolland McGiverin for Phil Telfeyan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11535515) by on behalf of NATHAN ALEXANDER, GRACIELA RODGRIGUEZ, KHALID SALAHUDDIN, CHARLES STEVENS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGiverin, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter to attorney Marissa K. Hatton regarding attorney admission to the Western District of Texas. (bc) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to attorney Phil Telfeyan regarding atorney admission to the Western District of Texas. (bc) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11521456). No Summons requested at this time, filed by KHALID SALAHUDDIN, CHARLES STEVENS, NATHAN ALEXANDER, GRACIELA RODGRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(McGiverin, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Rolland McGiverin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phil Telfeyan