This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Robinson v. Litscher et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 Robinson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Litscher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01117

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victor Robinson

Waupun, WI 53963-0351

Defendants

CO Tafoya

Warden Gary Boughton

CO Tyler Rudie

Mark Kartman

Jon E Litscher

John and Jane Doe

RN Jolinda Waterman

Sandra McArdle

CO Finnell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Victor Robinson. (Darkened as much as possible) (cms)

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Victor Robinson. (Darkened as much as possible) (cms)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT in support of the motion for appointment of counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(cms)

#9

(#9) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before August 22, 2018, Robinson shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $5.41 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, warden)(asc)

8 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

4 #1

Exhibit

#6

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) LETTER from the Clerk to Victor Robinson regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Victor Robinson. (cms)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Order to pay partial filing fee from prisoner's release account by Victor Robinson. (cms)

#5

(#5) LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph also requesting the trust account statement be filed within 21 days. Mailed to plaintiff. (cms)

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • BALANCE of INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $.20, receipt number MK4689-073470. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Order to pay partial filing fee from prisoner's release account by Victor Robinson. (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • PARTIAL INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $5.21, receipt number MK4689-073321. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before August 22, 2018, Robinson shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $5.41 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, warden)(asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER from the Clerk to Victor Robinson regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Victor Robinson. (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Victor Robinson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph also requesting the trust account statement be filed within 21 days. Mailed to plaintiff. (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT in support of the motion for appointment of counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Victor Robinson. (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Victor Robinson. (Darkened as much as possible) (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Victor Robinson. (Darkened as much as possible) (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.