This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Robinson et al v. Foster et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 Robinson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Foster. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy Joseph and William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01535

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nancy Joseph

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Victor Robinson

Waupun, WI 53963-0351

Tayr Kilaab al Ghashiyah

Waupun, WI 53963-0351

John Albert Casteel

Waupun, WI 53963-0351

Respondents

Brian Foster

Daniel J Gabler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Exhibit

#17

(#17) NOTICE by John Albert Casteel (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(cms) (Main Document 17 replaced on 11/14/2018 with darker scan) (mac). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#16

(#16) ...(continued from ECF #15 ) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Robinson and al Ghashiyah's petition be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Case reassigned to Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel, petitioners)(asc)

#15

(#15) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED that al Ghashiyah's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of thefiling fee (Docket #6 ) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that al Ghashiyah's Motion for Order for Rule 60 Remedy(Docket #13 ) is DENIED. (continued below)... (asc)

14 #1

Cover Letter

#14

(#14) OBJECTIONS to E-filing program by John Albert Casteel. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(asc) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Order for Rule 60 rememdy by John Albert Casteel. (cms)

12 #1

Cover Letter

#12

(#12) RESPONSE re #7 Order filed by John Albert Casteel. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(asc)

#11

(#11) ORDER from USCA for the Seventh Circuit re Sanction by John Albert Casteel. (asc)

#10

(#10) LETTER from the Clerk to Victor Robinson regarding electronic signatures and the requirement that he submit all future filings through the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: Victor Robinson via U.S. Mail) (tlf)

9 #1

Cover Letter

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Common Law Objections and Remedy by Victor Robinson (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(asc) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

8 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

#8

(#8) LETTER from the Clerk to John Albert Casteel regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)

#7

(#7) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Al Ghashiyah has until October 31, 2018, to respond to this order by explaining whether he wishes to withdraw this petition or proceed with it under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Robinson has until October 31, 2018, to respond to this order by explaining whether he wishes to withdraw this petition or proceed with it under 28 U.S.C. 2254. (cc: all counsel, petitioners w/ forms)(asc)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Tayr Kilaab al Ghashiyah. (asc) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#5

(#5) Supplemental Material by Tayr Kilaab al Ghashiyah. (asc) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE by John Albert Casteel (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(cms) (Main Document 17 replaced on 11/14/2018 with darker scan) (mac). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ...(continued from ECF #15 ) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Robinson and al Ghashiyah's petition be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Case reassigned to Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel, petitioners)(asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED that al Ghashiyah's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of thefiling fee (Docket #6 ) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that al Ghashiyah's Motion for Order for Rule 60 Remedy(Docket #13 ) is DENIED. (continued below)... (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) OBJECTIONS to E-filing program by John Albert Casteel. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(asc) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Order for Rule 60 rememdy by John Albert Casteel. (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE re #7 Order filed by John Albert Casteel. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER from USCA for the Seventh Circuit re Sanction by John Albert Casteel. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER from the Clerk to Victor Robinson regarding electronic signatures and the requirement that he submit all future filings through the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: Victor Robinson via U.S. Mail) (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Common Law Objections and Remedy by Victor Robinson (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(asc) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER from the Clerk to John Albert Casteel regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Al Ghashiyah has until October 31, 2018, to respond to this order by explaining whether he wishes to withdraw this petition or proceed with it under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Robinson has until October 31, 2018, to respond to this order by explaining whether he wishes to withdraw this petition or proceed with it under 28 U.S.C. 2254. (cc: all counsel, petitioners w/ forms)(asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Tayr Kilaab al Ghashiyah. (asc) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Supplemental Material by Tayr Kilaab al Ghashiyah. (asc) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Supplemental Material by Tayr Kilaab al Ghashiyah. (asc) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from the clerk to petitioner re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph, Request to Proceed without Prepaying along with a trust account statement or the filing fee be filed within 21 days. Mailed to Robinson. (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Docket Annotation; petition filed only on behalf of Robinson and not Ghashiyah due to being a restricted filer. Please see order attached. (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Victor Robinson. (Attachments: #1 cover letter #2 Exhibits) (cms). Modified on 10/1/2018 to add exhibits(cms). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.