This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2018 at 00:36:38 (UTC).

Robinson v. Dignity Health d/b/a Chandler Regional Medical Center

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 Robinson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Dignity Health d/b/a Chandler Regional Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:16-CV-03035

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josef Robinson

Defendant

Dignity Health d/b/a Chandler Regional Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Block

Joshua A. Block(Designation Retained)

Leslie Cooper(Designation Retained)

Elizabeth O. Gill(Designation Retained)

Darrell Lavar Hill(Designation Retained)

Christine Patricia Sun(Designation Retained)

Defendant Attorneys

Reid P Davis

Barry Scott Landsberg

Barry William Lee

Joanna Sobol McCallum

Christopher Aaron Rheinheimer

Harvey L. Rochman

Andrew Lee Satenberg

 

Court Documents

#72

#80

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 79 Notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/28/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDER GRANTING STAY; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting 64 Motion to Stay. The Court VACATES the motion hearing set for 12/13/2016. The case management conference set for 12/13/16 is VACATED. Compliance hearing is set for Friday, 3/17/2017 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Filing by 3/10/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016) Modified on 12/6/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less