This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2018 at 05:56:42 (UTC).

Robinson v. Correct Care Solutions, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 Robinson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Correct Care Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McDonald and Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00283

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin McDonald

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronnie Robinson

Defendants

Ron Lawerenz

Peggy Wadman

Correct Care Solutions, LLC

Heinz-Peter Schafer

Travis Baker

Chantell Lawson

B Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard A Harpootlian

Attorney at Richard A. Harpootlian Law Office

1410 Laurel Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Christopher P Kenney

Attorney at Richard A. Harpootlian Law Office

1410 Laurel Street

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7590575.), filed by Ronnie Robinson. Service due by 5/2/2018(kric, ) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ronnie Robinson.(kric, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/2/2018) (kric, ). (Entered: 02/02/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ronnie Robinson.(kric, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/2/2018) (kric, ). (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7590575.), filed by Ronnie Robinson. Service due by 5/2/2018(kric, ) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.