This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2018 at 07:33:39 (UTC).

Roberts v. Teamsters Local 955 et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 Roberts filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Teamsters Local 955. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg Kays and Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00745

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Greg Kays

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Roberts

Defendants

John Does 1-5

Teamsters Local 955

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Schermerhorn

Attorney at The Klamann Law Firm

4435 Main Street, Suite 150

Kansas City, MO 64111

Paul Douglas Anderson

Attorney at The Klamann Law Firm

4435 Main Street, Suite 150

Kansas City, MO 64111

George E. Kapke, Jr.

Attorney at Kapke & Willerth, LLC

3304 Ne Ralph Powell Rd.

Lee'S Summit, MO 64064

John M. Klamann

Attorney at The Klamann Law Firm

4435 Main Street, Suite 150

Kansas City, MO 64111

Michael J. Fleming

Attorney at Kapke & Willerth, LLC

3304 Ne Ralph Powell Rd.

Lee'S Summit, MO 64064

Defendant Attorney

Michael Amash

Attorney at Blake & Uhlig, PA

New Brotherhood Building, 753 State Avenue, Suite 475

Kansas City, KS 66101

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schermerhorn, Andrew) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#17

(#17) CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#12

(#12) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Amash, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#8

(#8) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts. Reply suggestions due by 10/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#16

(#16) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion to remand, Doc. #5 , is granted. However, Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees and costs is denied. Defendant's motion to dismiss, Doc. #3 , is denied for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The case is remanded to the Seventh Judicial Circuit Court of Clay County, Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 11/16/2018 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Levy, Lindsey) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#15

(#15) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bill Sanders(Kapke, George) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Greg Kays no longer assigned to case. Signed on 10/15/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#6

(#6) SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Amash, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

4 #1

Exhibit A - CBA

#7

(#7) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 11/2/2018. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/16/2018. Signed on 10/2/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts.(Kapke, George) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#9

(#9) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. Reply suggestions due by 10/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Amash, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#4

(#4) SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Amash, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955.(Amash, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion to remand, Doc. #5 , is granted. However, Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees and costs is denied. Defendant's motion to dismiss, Doc. #3 , is denied for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The case is remanded to the Seventh Judicial Circuit Court of Clay County, Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 11/16/2018 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Levy, Lindsey) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bill Sanders(Kapke, George) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955.(Amash, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts.(Kapke, George) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Amash, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Greg Kays no longer assigned to case. Signed on 10/15/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. Reply suggestions due by 10/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Amash, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts. Reply suggestions due by 10/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 11/2/2018. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/16/2018. Signed on 10/2/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schermerhorn, Andrew) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Amash, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Amash, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial Circuit of Clay County County, case number 18CY-CV08224, filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5945659. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: CBA, #3 Exhibit C: State Court Docket)(Amash, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.