This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2018 at 07:17:29 (UTC).

Roberts v. Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 Roberts filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Gateway One Lending Finance, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathryn H. Vratil and Teresa J. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02526

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathryn H. Vratil

Referral Judge

Teresa J. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Russell Lee Roberts

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chelsea S. Springer

Attorney at The Law Offices of Tracy L. Robinson, LC

818 Grand Blvd., Suite 505

Kansas City, MO 64106

Defendant Attorneys

Danne Wayne Webb

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Benjamin D. Mooneyham

Attorney at German May PC

1201 Walnut Street, Suite 2000

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Mooneyham, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Experian plc as corporate parent . (Webb, Danne) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION for extension of time for Defendant Gateway One Lending & Finance to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Mooneyham, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#6

(#6) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin D. Mooneyham on behalf of Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC (Mooneyham, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Russell Lee Roberts upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Springer, Chelsea) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

4 #1

Exhibit Return Receipt

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Russell Lee Roberts upon Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Springer, Chelsea) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Russell Lee Roberts. (Springer, Chelsea) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4596959.), filed by Russell Lee Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Springer, Chelsea) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Second Extension of Time for Defendant Gateway One Lending & Finance to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant Gateway One Lending & Finance is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including December 10, 2018, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint for Damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Mooneyham, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Experian plc as corporate parent . (Webb, Danne) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Webb, Danne) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Gateway One Lending & Finance to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant Gateway One Lending & Finance is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including November 25, 2018, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint for Damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/24/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION for extension of time for Defendant Gateway One Lending & Finance to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Mooneyham, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin D. Mooneyham on behalf of Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC (Mooneyham, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Russell Lee Roberts upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Springer, Chelsea) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Russell Lee Roberts upon Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Springer, Chelsea) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Russell Lee Roberts - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Springer, Chelsea) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Russell Lee Roberts. (Springer, Chelsea) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4596959.), filed by Russell Lee Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Springer, Chelsea) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less