This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2018 at 07:51:28 (UTC).

Roberts v. CMH Homes, Inc. (PLR2)

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 Roberts filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CMH Homes, Inc PLR2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00322

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen L Roberts

Defendant

CMH Homes, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W. Allen McDonald

Attorney at Lacy, Price & Wagner, P.C.

249 North Peters Road, Suite 101

Knoxville, TN 37923

James H Price

Attorney at Lacy, Price & Wagner, P.C.

249 North Peters Road, Suite 101

Knoxville, TN 37923

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy B McConnell

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (Knox)

265 Brookview Centre Way, Suite 600

Knoxville, TN 37919

Ronald S Range, III

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (Johnson)

100 Med Tech Parkway, Suite 200

Johnson City, TN 37604

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/10/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#12

(#12) Defendant's ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by CMH Homes, Inc..(McConnell, Timothy) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against CMH Homes, Inc.., filed by Karen L Roberts.(Price, James) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#10

(#10) Certificate of Corporate Interest by CMH Homes, Inc.. (McConnell, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

9 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#9

(#9) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on August 29, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AYB) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss) filed by CMH Homes, Inc.. (McConnell, Timothy) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss) by CMH Homes, Inc.. (McConnell, Timothy) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen L Roberts. CMH Homes, Inc. served on 8/10/2018. (McDonald, W.) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on August 9, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on August 9, 2018. (RLK.) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to CMH Homes, Inc. (RLK) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

1 #2

Supplement Summons to be Issued

1 #1

Supplement Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CMH Homes, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3738255.), filed by Karen L Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons to be Issued)(McDonald, W.) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/10/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Defendant's ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by CMH Homes, Inc..(McConnell, Timothy) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against CMH Homes, Inc.., filed by Karen L Roberts.(Price, James) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Corporate Interest by CMH Homes, Inc.. (McConnell, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on August 29, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AYB) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by CMH Homes, Inc. (AYB) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss) filed by CMH Homes, Inc.. (McConnell, Timothy) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss) by CMH Homes, Inc.. (McConnell, Timothy) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen L Roberts. CMH Homes, Inc. served on 8/10/2018. (McDonald, W.) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on August 9, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on August 9, 2018. (RLK.) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on August 9, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (RLK) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to CMH Homes, Inc. (RLK) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CMH Homes, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3738255.), filed by Karen L Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons to be Issued)(McDonald, W.) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less