This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:19 (UTC).

Robert Andre Warfield v. Elijah Goffigan et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Robert Andre Warfield filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Elijah Goffigan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Gail J. Standish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07395

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Andre Warfield

Wasco, CA 93280

Defendants

Marco Grajales

Elijah Goffigan

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Robert Andre Warfield. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Denying #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee, with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (gk) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#4

(#4) Inmate Statement Report re Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #2 filed by Plaintiff Robert Andre Warfield. (ec) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Elijah Goffigan, Marco Grajales pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, filed by plaintiff Robert Andre Warfield. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Denying #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee, with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (gk) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Inmate Statement Report re Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #2 filed by Plaintiff Robert Andre Warfield. (ec) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Robert Andre Warfield. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Elijah Goffigan, Marco Grajales pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, filed by plaintiff Robert Andre Warfield. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.