This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2019 at 07:06:36 (UTC).

Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON v. Officer John Doe et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2018 Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Officer John Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan H. Lefkow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07476

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan H. Lefkow

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON

Beatrice Roberson

Defendants

Officer John Doe

The Village of Midlothian

Respondent

Illinois State Police

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Monica Ghosh

Attorney at Gregory E. Kulis & Associates, Ltd.

Brian M Orozco

Attorney at Gregory E. Kulis & Associates, Ltd.

30 N. Lasalle, Suite #2140

Chicago, IL 60602

Gregory E. Kulis

Attorney at Gregory E. Kulis and Associates, Ltd.

30 North Lasalle Street, Suite 2140

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Julie M Koerner

Attorney at O'Halloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook LLC

650 Dundee Road, Suite 475

Northbrook, IL 60062

Michael J. Victor

Attorney at O'Halloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook LLC

650 Dundee Road, Suite 475

Northbrook, IL 60062

Clifford Gary Kosoff

Attorney at O'Halloran, Kosoff, Helander & Geitner, P.C.

650 Dundee Road, Suite 475

Northbrook, IL 60062

Respondent Attorney

Michael Charles Stephenson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

100 W. Randolph St., 13 Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing held. Responses for motions #30 and #32 are due by 1/29/2019; replies by 2/5/2019; motion hearings for #30 and #32 set for 1/16/2019 are stricken. Motion hearing on motion to compel #34 remains set for 1/16/2019. Status hearing, motion hearing on #30 and #32 , and oral arguments are set for 2/13/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

34 #5

Exhibit Grp Ex 5

34 #4

Exhibit Grp Ex 4

34 #1

Exhibit Grp Ex 1

#34

(#34) MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson to compel compliance with subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grp Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Grp Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Grp Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Grp Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Grp Ex 5)(Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#32

(#32) MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson for sanctions for Illinois State Police's failure to comply with deadlines agreed to and set by the Court (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

30 #3

Exhibit

30 #2

Exhibit

#30

(#30) MOTION by Respondent Illinois State Police to stay its response to Plaintiff's subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

8 #1

Service List

#7

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/16/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Service List)(Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

6 #1

Notice of Filing

#6

(#6) ATTORNEYS' LIEN by Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON by Monica Ghosh (Ghosh, Monica) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON by Brian M Orozco (Orozco, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON by Gregory E. Kulis (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15169821.(Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing held. Responses for motions #30 and #32 are due by 1/29/2019; replies by 2/5/2019; motion hearings for #30 and #32 set for 1/16/2019 are stricken. Motion hearing on motion to compel #34 remains set for 1/16/2019. Status hearing, motion hearing on #30 and #32 , and oral arguments are set for 2/13/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion to compel #34 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson to compel compliance with subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grp Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Grp Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Grp Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Grp Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Grp Ex 5)(Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion for sanctions #32 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson for sanctions for Illinois State Police's failure to comply with deadlines agreed to and set by the Court (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Charles Stephenson for presentment of motion to stay #30 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION by Respondent Illinois State Police to stay its response to Plaintiff's subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Defendants' motion for extension of time #24 is granted. The deadline for the State Police to respond to Plaintiff's subpoena is extended to 1/4/2019. Plaintiff's motion to compel subpoena #26 is granted in part. Defendants shall comply with the subpoena by 1/4/2019. Any request for attorneys' fees must be brought by separate motion, thus this portion of the motion is denied. Status hearing remains set for 1/8/2019. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Plaintiff's motion to compel #26 will be heard at 11:00 a.m. on 1/8/2019 (not 9:00 a.m.) along with the other outstanding motion and status hearing. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion to compel #26 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Due to the Court being unavailable on 11/16/2018, the motion hearing set for that date is stricken and reset to 11/20/2018 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/16/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Service List)(Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice RobersonPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEYS' LIEN by Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON by Monica Ghosh (Ghosh, Monica) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON by Brian M Orozco (Orozco, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON by Gregory E. Kulis (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15169821.(Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois State Police Master Sergeant is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Charles Stephenson