This case was last updated from PACER on 02/19/2019 at 07:48:12 (UTC).

RLR Investments, LLC v. City of Pleasant Valley, MO

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 RLR Investments, LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Pleasant Valley, MO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg Kays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01003

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RLR Investments, LLC

Defendant

City of Pleasant Valley, MO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew William Geary

Attorney at Dysart, Taylor, Cotter, McMonigle & Montemore, P.C.

4420 Madison Avenue, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64111

Patrick Kevin McMonigle

Attorney at Dysart, Taylor, Cotter, McMonigle & Montemore, P.C.

4420 Madison Avenue, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64111

Defendant Attorneys

Jerome E. Brant

Attorney at Withers, Brant, Igoe & Mullennix

2 South Main

Liberty, MO 64068

Ward K. Brown

Attorney at Withers, Brant, Igoe & Mullennix, PC

2 South Main

Liberty, MO 64068

Allen R. Jones, II

Attorney at Withers, Brant, Igoe & Mullennix, PC

Two South Main Street

Liberty, MO 64068

Travis A. Wymore

Attorney at Withers, Brant, Igoe & Mullennix, PC

Two South Main Street

Liberty, MO 64068

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A-Defendant's Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiff's M

#14

(#14) MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply To Plaintiffs Reply in Support Of It's Motion To Remand filed by Ward K. Brown on behalf of City of Pleasant Valley, MO. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Defendant's Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Brown, Ward) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ward K. Brown on behalf of Defendant City of Pleasant Valley, MO.(Brown, Ward) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

#12

(#12) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Matthew William Geary on behalf of Plaintiff RLR Investments, LLC. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Geary, Matthew) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#11

(#11) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Ward K. Brown on behalf of Defendant City of Pleasant Valley, MO. Reply suggestions due by 2/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Brown, Ward) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#10

(#10) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Judge Charles Atwell(Geary, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

9 #1

MAP General Order

#9

(#9) AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP re-assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

8 #18

Exhibit 18

8 #17

Exhibit 17

8 #16

Exhibit 16

8 #15

Exhibit 15

8 #14

Exhibit 14

8 #13

Exhibit 13

8 #12

Exhibit 12

8 #11

Exhibit 11

#8

(#8) SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Matthew William Geary on behalf of Plaintiff RLR Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10 - see Exhibit 24, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Geary, Matthew) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Crocker, Susan). (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Crocker, Susan). (Attachment 15 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Crocker, Susan). (Attachment 18 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Crocker, Susan). (Attachment 19 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Crocker, Susan). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2019: #24 Exhibit 24) (Crocker, Susan). Modified on 1/23/2019 (Crocker, Susan). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to remand filed by Matthew William Geary on behalf of RLR Investments, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geary, Matthew) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply To Plaintiffs Reply in Support Of It's Motion To Remand filed by Ward K. Brown on behalf of City of Pleasant Valley, MO. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Defendant's Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Brown, Ward) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ward K. Brown on behalf of Defendant City of Pleasant Valley, MO.(Brown, Ward) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Matthew William Geary on behalf of Plaintiff RLR Investments, LLC. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Geary, Matthew) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Ward K. Brown on behalf of Defendant City of Pleasant Valley, MO. Reply suggestions due by 2/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Brown, Ward) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Judge Charles Atwell(Geary, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP re-assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Matthew William Geary on behalf of Plaintiff RLR Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10 - see Exhibit 24, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Geary, Matthew) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Crocker, Susan). (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Crocker, Susan). (Attachment 15 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Crocker, Susan). (Attachment 18 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Crocker, Susan). (Attachment 19 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Crocker, Susan). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2019: #24 Exhibit 24) (Crocker, Susan). Modified on 1/23/2019 (Crocker, Susan). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Matthew William Geary on behalf of Plaintiff RLR Investments, LLC.(Geary, Matthew) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to remand filed by Matthew William Geary on behalf of RLR Investments, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geary, Matthew) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 2/5/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/19/2019. Signed on 1/3/19 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant City of Pleasant Valley, Missouri's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition on behalf of City of Pleasant Valley, MO.(Brown, Ward) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by City of Pleasant Valley, MO (Brown, Ward) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court of Clay County, Missouri County, case number 16CY-CV01327, filed by Ward K. Brown on behalf of City of Pleasant Valley, MO. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6091636. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Brown, Ward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2018: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.