This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 13:02:17 (UTC).

Rivera v. Huntington Ingalls Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 Rivera filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Jane Triche Milazzo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-06795

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judith Punch Rivera

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Foster Wheeler Constructors, Inc.

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Arrowood Indemnity Company

Eagle, Inc.

McCarty Corporation

Owens Illinois, Inc

Foster Wheeler, LLC

AMEC Foster Wheeler Constructors, Inc.

Crown, Cork & Seal USA, Inc.

Owens-Illinois, Inc.

Huntington Ingalls, Inc.

Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.

Foster Wheeler Corporation

Foster Wheeler, Inc.

Owens-Illinois, Inc. doing business as O-I

Avondale Industries, Inc.

Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.

Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.

Avondale Shipyards, Inc

Cross Claimant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant

Huntington Ingalls, Inc.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Joseph Finckbeiner, Jr.

Attorney at The Law Office of John J. Finckbeiner, Jr.

2203 Packenham Drive

Chalmette, LA 70043

Defendant, Cross Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lawrence G. Pugh, III

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Donna M. Young

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jacqueline Romero

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Douglas Watson Redfearn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Nicole M. Loup

Attorney at Nicole M. Loup, Attorney at Law

201 Holiday Blvd., Ste. 335

Covington, LA 70433

James H. Brown, Jr.

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Lacey Taylor McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelsey A. Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Michael D. Lonegrass

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St. Suite 4040, 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70139

Rodger Gregory Green, Jr.

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St. Suite 4040, 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70139

Mary Reeves Arthur

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol St., Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4350

New Orleans, LA 70139

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alex Tyler Robertson

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Thomas L. Cougill

Attorney at Willingham Fultz & Cougill, LLP (Houston)

5625 Cypress Creek Pwky, 6Th Floor

Houston, TX 77069

Jennifer D. Zajac

Attorney at Willingham Fultz & Cougill, LLP (Houston)

5625 Cypress Creek Pwky, 6Th Floor

Houston, TX 77069

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence G. Pugh, III

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Donna M. Young

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jacqueline Romero

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Douglas Watson Redfearn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Nicole M. Loup

Attorney at Nicole M. Loup, Attorney at Law

201 Holiday Blvd., Ste. 335

Covington, LA 70433

James H. Brown, Jr.

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Lacey Taylor McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelsey A. Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Mary Reeves Arthur

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol St., Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4350

New Orleans, LA 70139

Thomas L. Cougill

Attorney at Willingham Fultz & Cougill, LLP (Houston)

5625 Cypress Creek Pwky, 6Th Floor

Houston, TX 77069

Jennifer D. Zajac

Attorney at Willingham Fultz & Cougill, LLP (Houston)

5625 Cypress Creek Pwky, 6Th Floor

Houston, TX 77069

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

15 #3

Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum

15 #2

Proposed Order

#15

#2

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2018 before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand (Rec. Doc. #9 ) was argued by counsel and taken under submission by the Court. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (sa) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER that oral argument previously set for September 5, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. regarding #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court is RESET for 9/12/2018 9:30 AM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Further Ordered that this order shall not be interpreted to alter the briefing deadlines for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and to Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages contained therein, by Huntington Ingalls, Inc..(Trapolin, Edward) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the request for #18 Oral Argument is GRANTED, and oral argument on the Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. #9 ) is SET for September 5, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party is limited to 7 minutes of argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order shall not be interpreted to alter the briefing deadlines for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, and all briefs shall be submitted by August 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/21/2018.(sa) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Huntington Ingalls, Inc. regarding #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Trapolin, Edward) (Entered: 08/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Judith Punch Rivera re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ecm) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/17/18. (ecm) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Judith Punch Rivera. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum)(Williams, L.) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Huntington Ingalls, Inc. re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Trapolin, Edward) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls, Inc. re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand (to Plaintiffs First Supplemental and Amending Petition) by AMEC Foster Wheeler Constructors, Inc..Attorney James H. Brown, Jr added to party AMEC Foster Wheeler Constructors, Inc.(pty:dft).(Brown, James) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Judith Punch Rivera. Motion will be submitted on 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Notice of Submission, #9 Proposed Order) (Williams, L.) Modified text/submission on 7/26/2018 (sa). (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney John Joseph Hainkel, III, Angela M. Bowlin, James H. Brown, Jr, Magali Ann Puente-Martin, Kelsey A. Eagan, Kelly L. Long, Lacey Taylor McCoy for Foster Wheeler, LLC. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/25/18. (ecm) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Foster Wheeler, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney James H. Brown, Jr added to party Foster Wheeler, LLC.(pty:dft).(Brown, James) Modified on 7/25/2018 (sa). (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand Answer to First Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages by Owens-Illinois, Inc..Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party Owens-Illinois, Inc.(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice - The Petition for Damages attached to #1 Notice of Removal lists counsel from State Court who have not been admitted to practice in this Court (Attorneys Natalie A. Williams and Alexis C. Normand). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this Court's Procedures for Admission. Future filings which lists attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 will not be accepted. (sa) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls, Inc. Issued by Clerk. (sa) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • (#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Trapolin, Edward) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2017-8462 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7009610) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Huntington Ingalls Inc.(pty:dft).(Trapolin, Edward) Modified text on 7/19/2018 (sa). (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMEC Foster Wheeler Constructors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Avondale Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Reilly-Benton, Inc. is a litigant