This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2020 at 19:19:23 (UTC).

Rio Linda Elverta Community Water District v. USA, et al.,

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 Rio Linda Elverta Community Water District filed a Property - Land lawsuit against USA, . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William B. Shubb, Gregory G. Hollows, Kimberly J. Mueller and Carolyn K. Delaney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-01349

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William B. Shubb

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judges

Gregory G. Hollows

Carolyn K. Delaney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rio Linda Elverta Community Water District

Defendants

Honeywell Incorporated

E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company

BASF Corporation

PPG Incorporated

Occidental Chemical Corporation

Sigma-Aldrich Corporation

Elementis Chromium Incorporated

United States of America

Luxfer Holdings PLC

Dow Chemical Company

Univar Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Victor M. Sher

Attorney at Sher Edling LLP

425 California Street, Suite 810

San Francisco, CA 94104

Matthew K. Edling

Attorney at Sher Edling LLP

100 Montgomery St., Suite 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie N. Kang

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Sean O. Morris

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Andrew Thomas Mortl

Attorney at Glynn & Finley, LLP

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Avenue, Suite 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Amber Melia Trincado

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Bailey Langner

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

101 2Nd Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Gennaro August Filice, III

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Gary J. Smith

Attorney at Beveridge and Diamond PC

456 Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104-4438

Kaitlyn D. Shannon

Attorney at Beveridge & Diamond P.C

456 Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

David M. Metres

Attorney at Barg Coffin Lewis & Trapp, LLP

350 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

John Frank Barg

Attorney at Barg Coffin Lewis & Trapp, LLP

350 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-1435

Ella Burn Foley-Gannon

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1 Market - Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Ellie Frances Chapman

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

One Market Street, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Michael Alan Schrama

Attorney at United States Department Of Justice

601 D Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

David Domagala Mitchell

Attorney at US DOJ Enrd Environmental Defense Section

Po Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044

Michael L. Williams

Attorney at U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division

P.O. Box 340 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Shari Howard, GOVT

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044

Landon David Bailey

Attorney at Bailey PLC

641 Fulton Avenue, Suite 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

Deepi Miller

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1201 K Street, Suite 1100

Sacramento, CA 95814

23 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#104

(#104) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Meghan M. Baker on behalf of Dow Chemical Company. Attorney Baker, Meghan M. added. (Baker, Meghan) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#103

(#103) NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Clifton J. McFarland. Attorney McFarland, Clifton J. added. (McFarland, Clifton) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#102

(#102) PRO HAC VICE ORDERsigned by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/12/2020. Added attorney Stephen M. Packman, PHV for Luxfer Holdings PLC. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#101

(#101) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/12/2020. Added attorney Carlos M. Bollar, PHV for Luxfer Holdings PLC.(Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#100

(#100) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/10/20 ENLARGING the page limit for U.S.'s Memorandum of Law in support of its Motion to Dismiss by 15 pages, not to exceed 35 pages. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#99

(#99) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Enlarged Page Limit by United States of America. (Howard, Shari) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

98 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#98

(#98) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Luxfer Holdings PLC for attorney Stephen M. Packman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8764481) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bailey, Landon) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

97 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#6

(#7) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (AMENDING #6 Order Setting Status Conference) (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Donati, J) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/6/2017 DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another judge for all further proceedings and to make the appropriate adjustments in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for such reassignment. Senior Judge William B. Shubb RECUSED; District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ASSIGNED. New case number: 2:17-cv-01349 KJM GGH. (Michel, G.) (Entered: 07/06/2017)

4 #2

VDRP

4 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A) (Entered: 06/30/2017)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *BASF Corporation, Dow Chemical Company, E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Elementis Chromium Incorporated, Honeywell Incorporated, Luxfer Holdings PLC, Occidental Chemical Corporation, PPG Incorporated, Sigma-Aldrich Corporation, Univar Incorporated* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Victor M. Sher* *Sher Edling LLP* *425 California St., Ste. 810* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Benson, A) (Entered: 06/30/2017)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Victor M. Sher* *Sher Edling LLP* *425 California St., Ste. 810* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Benson, A) (Entered: 06/30/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Rio Linda Elverta Community Water District. Attorney Sher, Victor M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7138605) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sher, Victor) (Entered: 06/30/2017)

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Meghan M. Baker on behalf of Dow Chemical Company. Attorney Baker, Meghan M. added. (Baker, Meghan) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Clifton J. McFarland. Attorney McFarland, Clifton J. added. (McFarland, Clifton) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) PRO HAC VICE ORDERsigned by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/12/2020. Added attorney Stephen M. Packman, PHV for Luxfer Holdings PLC. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/12/2020. Added attorney Carlos M. Bollar, PHV for Luxfer Holdings PLC.(Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/10/20 ENLARGING the page limit for U.S.'s Memorandum of Law in support of its Motion to Dismiss by 15 pages, not to exceed 35 pages. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Enlarged Page Limit by United States of America. (Howard, Shari) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Luxfer Holdings PLC for attorney Stephen M. Packman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8764481) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bailey, Landon) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Luxfer Holdings PLC for attorney Carlos Bollar to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8764468) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bailey, Landon) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/6/2020 LIFTING STAY, SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, and DENYING as MOOT #83 Motion to Lift Stay. Within 60 days of entry of this Order, Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' operative complaints by either (a) answering, (b) filing a new Motion to Dismiss, or (c) amending or withdrawing a pending Motion to Dismiss. The party filing such a motion shall select a hearing date no sooner than 120 days after entry of this Order. Within 90 days of entry of this Order, each Plaintiff shall respond to any pending Motion to Dismiss by filing an opposition or by amending its complaint. Defendants shall have 105 days from the entry of this Order to file any reply in support of their Motion(s) to Dismiss. Should either Plaintiff respond to a motion to dismiss by amending its complaint, the following briefing schedule shall apply: Within 60 days of the filing of an amended complaint, Defendants shall respond to such amended complaint(s) by answering or filing a Motion to Dismiss. The party filing such a motion shall select a hearing date no sooner than 120 days after the filing of the amended complaint. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to a Motion to Dismiss an amended complaint within 90 days of the filing of an amended complaint. Defendants shall have 105 days from the filing of an amended complaint to file any reply in support of a Motion to Dismiss. All discovery is STAYED until 45 days after all Defendants remaining in the action answer following the Court's resolution of any motions to dismiss filed by any Defendant. The deadline for the parties to exchange Initial Disclosures is DEFERRED to 45 days after all Defendants remaining in the action answer following the Court's resolution of any motions to dismiss filed by any Defendant. (York, M) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Lifting Stay and Setting Briefing Schedule by Rio Linda Elverta Community Water District. (Sloane, Timothy) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Univar Incorporated. Attorney Alexander, William L. added.(Alexander, William) (Entered: 08/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/02/17 ORDERING that this case be RELATED to case number 2:17-cv-1353 KJM GGH. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:17-cv-01353 by Rio Linda Elverta Community Water District. Attorney Sloane, Timothy R. added. (Sloane, Timothy) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (AMENDING #6 Order Setting Status Conference) (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Donati, J) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER SETTING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE; Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 11/9/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (Michel, G.) (Entered: 07/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/6/2017 DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another judge for all further proceedings and to make the appropriate adjustments in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for such reassignment. Senior Judge William B. Shubb RECUSED; District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ASSIGNED. New case number: 2:17-cv-01349 KJM GGH. (Michel, G.) (Entered: 07/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A) (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *BASF Corporation, Dow Chemical Company, E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Elementis Chromium Incorporated, Honeywell Incorporated, Luxfer Holdings PLC, Occidental Chemical Corporation, PPG Incorporated, Sigma-Aldrich Corporation, Univar Incorporated* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Victor M. Sher* *Sher Edling LLP* *425 California St., Ste. 810* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Benson, A) (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Victor M. Sher* *Sher Edling LLP* *425 California St., Ste. 810* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Benson, A) (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Rio Linda Elverta Community Water District. Attorney Sher, Victor M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7138605) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sher, Victor) (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less