This case was last updated from PACER on 04/03/2018 at 11:06:10 (UTC).

RIFAI v. CMS MEDICAL CARE CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2015 RIFAI filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CMS MEDICAL CARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-01395

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUHAMAD ALY RIFAI

Defendants

ANDREW E. HARRIS

GNADEN HUETTEN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

CMS MEDICAL CARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOB M. SITMAN(Designation Retained)

 

Court Documents

#71

(#71) OPINION/ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 56) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 64) IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS SHALL BE PERMITTED TO AMEND THEIR ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS WPCL CLAIM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/21/17. 9/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )

#32

(#32) ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION (DOCKET NO. 10) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 2/24/2016. 2/25/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, )

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) OPINION/ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 56) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 64) IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS SHALL BE PERMITTED TO AMEND THEIR ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS WPCL CLAIM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/21/17. 9/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION (DOCKET NO. 10) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 2/24/2016. 2/25/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, )

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.