This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2018 at 07:32:37 (UTC).

Rider v. Bluegrass Oxygen, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 Rider filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bluegrass Oxygen, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Danny C. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00456

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Danny C. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Rider

Defendants

Bluegrass Oxygen, Inc.

Michael Marnhout

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc Brandt

Attorney at Daley, Cottingham, Brandt & Associates

4034 Alexandria Pike

Cold Spring, KY 41034

Joseph P. Cottingham

Attorney at Daley, Cottingham, Brandt & Associates

4034 Alexandria Pike

Cold Spring, KY 41034

Mark J. Byrne

Attorney at Daley, Cottingham, Brandt & Associates

4034 Alexandria Pike

Cold Spring, KY 41034

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Exhibit D-Letter dated 11/30/17

7 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4119371), filed by Dennis Rider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B-EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit C-Email dated 11/28/17, #4 Exhibit D-Letter dated 11/30/17, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Mark J. Byrne to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dennis Rider ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4127798) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mark J. Byrne, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Byrne, Mark) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

7 #1

Affidavit Mark J. Byrne

#3

(#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/8/2010.(ECO)cc: COR Modified text to correct describe Order on 7/13/2018 (ECO). (Entered: 07/13/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C-Email dated 11/28/17

7 #3

Proposed Order

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Marc Brandt by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (GLD) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER: That this case be, and is hereby, TRANSFERREDTO THE CENTRAL DIVISION OF THIS COURT AT LEXINGTON re #1 Complaint, filed by Dennis Rider. (Intradistrict Transfer from Covington Division on 7/16/2018. Case Number 2:18-cv-117-WOB-CJS). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/16/2018.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 07/16/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A-EEOC Charge of Discrimination

1 #2

Exhibit B-EEOC Notice of Right to Sue

#8

(#8) ORDER: granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark J. Byrne on behalf of the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/26/2018. (GLD)cc: COR, Mark J. Byrne (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO Joseph Cottingham, a non-registered attorney re #3 Order,,, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge,, had to be MAILED TO a non-registered attorney, which is in direct violation of this court's General Orders re: Mandatory ECF. Failure to comply will result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, w/copy mailed to Atty Joseph Cottingham (ECO) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #9 Notice to Attorney Marc Brandt - NO RESPONSE (GLD) Modified on 9/5/2018 (GLD). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Marc Brandt by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (GLD) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark J. Byrne on behalf of the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/26/2018. (GLD)cc: COR, Mark J. Byrne (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • BAR STATUS Check completed as to Mark J. Byrne re #7 MOTION for Mark J. Byrne to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dennis Rider ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4127798). (GLD) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Mark J. Byrne to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dennis Rider ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4127798) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mark J. Byrne, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Byrne, Mark) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: #5 Order, Case Transferred In-Other Divisional Office. (ECO) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: That this case be, and is hereby, TRANSFERREDTO THE CENTRAL DIVISION OF THIS COURT AT LEXINGTON re #1 Complaint, filed by Dennis Rider. (Intradistrict Transfer from Covington Division on 7/16/2018. Case Number 2:18-cv-117-WOB-CJS). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/16/2018.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO Joseph Cottingham, a non-registered attorney re #3 Order,,, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge,, had to be MAILED TO a non-registered attorney, which is in direct violation of this court's General Orders re: Mandatory ECF. Failure to comply will result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, w/copy mailed to Atty Joseph Cottingham (ECO) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/8/2010.(ECO)cc: COR Modified text to correct describe Order on 7/13/2018 (ECO). (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4119371), filed by Dennis Rider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B-EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit C-Email dated 11/28/17, #4 Exhibit D-Letter dated 11/30/17, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.