This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 08:06:24 (UTC).

Richardson et al v. Baylor & Backus, CPAs et al (JRG3)

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Richardson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Baylor Backus, CPAs JRG3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J Ronnie Greer and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00200

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Ronnie Greer

Referral Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Parks Family, LLC

Charles P. Richardson

Defendants

Baylor & Backus, CPAs

The Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John E Haubenreich

Attorney at Waller, Lansden, Dortch & Davis, LLP (Nashville)

1201 Demonbruen Street, Suite 1000

Nashville, TN 37203

Defendant Attorneys

Glenn R Walter

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Knox)

One Centre Square, 620 Market Street, 5Th Floor

Knoxville, TN 37901

Randy M Kennedy

625 Anderson Street

Bristol, TN 37620

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by The Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust.(Kennedy, Randy) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Parks Family, LLC, Charles P. Richardson. (Haubenreich, John) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER re #9 Motion to Continue. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGE and DECREED that Defendant, The Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust shall have until January 11, 2019, to file Responsive Pleadings in this cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/11/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Richardson, Parks Family, LLC. The Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust served on 11/29/2018. (Haubenreich, John) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

9 #1

Other Agreed Order

#9

(#9) First MOTION to Continue by The Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Order)(Kennedy, Randy) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Baylor & Backus, CPAs. (Walter, Glenn) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Baylor & Backus, CPAs. (Walter, Glenn) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/19/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/19/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/19/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

2 #1

Summons Baylor & Backus, CPAs

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Baylor & Backus, CPAs, The Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons Baylor & Backus, CPAs)(ABF) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

1 #3

Summons Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust Summons

1 #2

Summons Baylor & Backus, CPAs Summons

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint by The Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust.(Kennedy, Randy) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Parks Family, LLC, Charles P. Richardson. (Haubenreich, John) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER re #9 Motion to Continue. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGE and DECREED that Defendant, The Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust shall have until January 11, 2019, to file Responsive Pleadings in this cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/11/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Richardson, Parks Family, LLC. The Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust served on 11/29/2018. (Haubenreich, John) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First MOTION to Continue by The Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Order)(Kennedy, Randy) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Baylor & Backus, CPAs. (Walter, Glenn) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Baylor & Backus, CPAs. (Walter, Glenn) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Richardson, Parks Family, LLC. Baylor & Backus, CPAs served on 11/20/2018. (Haubenreich, John) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/19/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/19/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/19/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Baylor & Backus, CPAs, The Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons Baylor & Backus, CPAs)(ABF) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (ABF) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3820107.), filed by Charles P. Richardson, Parks Family, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Baylor & Backus, CPAs Summons, #3 Summons Anne Frances Sells Grimes Irrevocable Trust Summons)(Haubenreich, John) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.