This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/24/2019 at 07:47:15 (UTC).

Rich v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 Rich filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph R. Goodwin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01541

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph R. Goodwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyler Rich

Defendants and Cross Defendants

FCA US LLC

Urse Dodge, Inc.

Fairmont Federal Credit Union

Defendant and Cross Claimant

Fairmont Federal Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David L. Grubb

Attorney at THE GRUBB LAW GROUP

1114 Kanawha Boulevard, East

Charleston, WV 25301

Kristina Thomas Whiteaker

Attorney at THE GRUBB LAW GROUP

1114 Kanawha Boulevard, East

Charleston, WV 25301

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Adam W. Martin

Attorney at SUTTER O'CONNELL & FARCHIONE

3600 Erieview Tower, 1301 East 9Th Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

James M. Popson

Attorney at SUTTER O'CONNELL & FARCHIONE

3600 Erieview Tower, 1301 East 9Th Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Colby S. Bryson

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO

Two Gateway Center, 10Th Floor, 603 Stanwix Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Edward A. Smallwood

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO

420 Fort Duquesne Boulevard, Suite 600, One Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Colby S. Bryson

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO

Two Gateway Center, 10Th Floor, 603 Stanwix Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Edward A. Smallwood

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO

420 Fort Duquesne Boulevard, Suite 600, One Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) CONFIRMATION from Northern District of West Virginia that the case has been opened in that district as 1:19-cv-00021, filed 2/12/2019. (slr)

#23

(#23) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the #17 MOTION by Fairmont Federal Credit Union to Transfer; the court TRANSFERS this action the Clarksburg Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/12/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party; Clerk, United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia) (taq)

#22

(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: the scheduling conference previously scheduled for 2/25/2019 is cancelled; directing this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 4/15/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 7/1/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 6/17/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 7/15/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 7/31/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery by 8/14/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 9/3/2019, with responses due by 9/17/2019, and replies due by 9/24/2019. Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment set for 10/24/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Settlement Meeting and mediation deadline by 11/4/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 11/12/2019, with responses due by 11/18/2019. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 11/8/2019, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 11/15/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2019 11:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Proposed jury instructions due by 12/9/2019. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 AM on 12/16/2019 in Charleston. Trial set for 12/17/2019 at 8:30 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kp)

#21

(#21) RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by FCA US LLC, Urse Dodge, Inc., Fairmont Federal Credit Union, Tyler Rich. (Martin, Adam) (Modified on 1/30/2019 to add party filers) (kp).

#20

(#20) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FAIRMONT FEDERAL CREDIT UNION'S #16 CROSS-CLAIMS to 2/18/2019 by FCA US LLC, Fairmont Federal Credit Union, Urse Dodge, Inc. (Martin, Adam)

#19

(#19) PROPOSED ORDER Order of Court by Fairmont Federal Credit Union (Bryson, Colby)

#17

(#17) MOTION by Fairmont Federal Credit Union to Transfer from U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division (Bryson, Colby)

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#16) AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fairmont Federal Credit Union and CROSSCLAIM by Fairmont Federal Credit Union against FCA US LLC, Urse Dodge, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Smallwood, Edward)

#5

(#5) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/23/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/4/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/11/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 a.m. on 2/25/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/4/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/11/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/2/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant FCA US LLC (Martin, Adam)

#3

(#3) ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC. (Martin, Adam)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#16) AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fairmont Federal Credit Union and CROSSCLAIM by Fairmont Federal Credit Union against FCA US LLC, Urse Dodge, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Smallwood, Edward)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CONFIRMATION from Northern District of West Virginia that the case has been opened in that district as 1:19-cv-00021, filed 2/12/2019. (slr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the #17 MOTION by Fairmont Federal Credit Union to Transfer; the court TRANSFERS this action the Clarksburg Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/12/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party; Clerk, United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia) (taq)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: the scheduling conference previously scheduled for 2/25/2019 is cancelled; directing this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 4/15/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 7/1/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 6/17/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 7/15/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 7/31/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery by 8/14/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 9/3/2019, with responses due by 9/17/2019, and replies due by 9/24/2019. Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment set for 10/24/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Settlement Meeting and mediation deadline by 11/4/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 11/12/2019, with responses due by 11/18/2019. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 11/8/2019, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 11/15/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2019 11:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Proposed jury instructions due by 12/9/2019. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 AM on 12/16/2019 in Charleston. Trial set for 12/17/2019 at 8:30 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by FCA US LLC, Urse Dodge, Inc., Fairmont Federal Credit Union, Tyler Rich. (Martin, Adam) (Modified on 1/30/2019 to add party filers) (kp).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FAIRMONT FEDERAL CREDIT UNION'S #16 CROSS-CLAIMS to 2/18/2019 by FCA US LLC, Fairmont Federal Credit Union, Urse Dodge, Inc. (Martin, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) PROPOSED ORDER Order of Court by Fairmont Federal Credit Union (Bryson, Colby)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Fairmont Federal Credit Union in support of #17 MOTION by Fairmont Federal Credit Union to Transfer from U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division (Bryson, Colby)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION by Fairmont Federal Credit Union to Transfer from U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division (Bryson, Colby)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fairmont Federal Credit Union and CROSSCLAIM by Fairmont Federal Credit Union against FCA US LLC, Urse Dodge, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Smallwood, Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1. ERROR: Image did not contain appropriate signature for counsel. CORRECTION: Signature corrected and image replaced. (kp)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Adam W. Martin on behalf of Urse Dodge, Inc. (Martin, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 and #7 Appearance of Counsel. ERROR: Incorrect forms used. CORRECTION: Forms corrected and images replaced. (kp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Colby S. Bryson on behalf of Fairmont Federal Credit Union. (Bryson, Colby) (Modified on 1/3/2019 to obtain correct form and replace image) (kp).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of Fairmont Federal Credit Union. (Smallwood, Edward) (Modified on 1/3/2019 to obtain correct form and replace image) (kp).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/23/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/4/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/11/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 a.m. on 2/25/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/4/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/11/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/2/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (ts)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant FCA US LLC (Martin, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC. (Martin, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC with summons, amended complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7006079. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colby S. Bryson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward A. Smallwood