This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2018 at 07:44:29 (UTC).

Reyes v. Entzel

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 Reyes filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Entzel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00139

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ramon Reyes

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent

Frederick Entzel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Helen Campbell Altmeyer

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Whg

Po Box 591

Wheeling, WV 26003

Christopher James Prezioso

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Whg

Po Box 591

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Roseboro Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/17/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

11 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#11

(#11) ORDER AND ROSEBORO NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/15/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF by Frederick Entzel re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Frederick Entzel. (Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Prezioso on behalf of Frederick Entzel (Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#7

(#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/18/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

6 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/17/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner; copy mailed to AUSA.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/4/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

3 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

2 #3

Certified Mail Return Receipt

2 #2

Court-Approved Form

2 #1

Court-Approved Form

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form, #2 Court-Approved Form). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Roseboro Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/17/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER AND ROSEBORO NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/15/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF by Frederick Entzel re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Frederick Entzel. (Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Prezioso on behalf of Frederick Entzel (Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/18/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/17/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner; copy mailed to AUSA.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002341 (tlg) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/4/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form, #2 Court-Approved Form). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Frederick Entzel, filed by Ramon Reyes. (Attachments: #1 memorandum in support of petition, #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less