This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 16:32:58 (UTC).

Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust et al v. National Grid USA et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against National Grid USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David N. Hurd and Andrew T. Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01267

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David N. Hurd

Referral Judge

Andrew T. Baxter

 

Party Details

Defendants

Fulton Iron & Steel Co. Inc.

Gardner Denver, Inc.

Lennox Industries Inc.

Solvents and Petroleum Service, Inc.

New Process Gear Corporation

Burko Corporation

Center Circles LLC

Libbey Glass Inc.

Prestolite Electric Incorporated

Syracuse China Company

Thompson Corners, LLC

Calocerinos and Spina

Metalico Syracuse Realty, Inc.

General Electric Corporation

Amparit Industries, LLC

Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation

United Technologies Corporation

Carlyle Air Conditioning Company Inc

Deere & Company

Carrier Corporation

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Yvonne E. Hennessey

Attorney at Barclay Damon LLP - Albany Office

80 State Street

Albany, NY 12207

Other Attorneys

Linda R. Shaw

Attorney at Knauf Shaw LLP

1400 Crossroads Building, 2 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Alan J. Knauf

Attorney at Knauf Shaw LLP

1400 Crossroads Building, 2 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Amy K. Kendall

Attorney at Knauf Shaw LLP

1400 Crossroads Building, 2 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Jonathan R Tantillo

Attorney at Knauf Shaw LLP

1400 Crossroads Building, 2 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

 

Court Documents

#63

(#63) STIPULATION executed by Telesector Resources Group, Inc. to extend time to answer and time to make mandatory disclosures by Racer Properties LLC, Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Tantillo, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/23/2018)

#61

(#61) STIPULATION executed by Deere & Company to extend time to answer and time to make mandatory disclosures, filed by Racer Properties LLC, Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#60

(#60) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust, Racer Properties LLC. Deere & Company waiver sent on 11/9/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#59

(#59) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Filling Order Libbey Glass Inc. served on Lynanne Gares on 12/20/2018, filed by Racer Properties LLC, Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#57

(#57) STIPULATION executed by Thompson Corners, LLC to extend time to answer and time to make mandatory disclosures, filed by Racer Properties LLC, Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#56

(#56) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust, Racer Properties LLC. Thompson Corners, LLC waiver sent on 11/9/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#55

(#55) STIPULATION executed by Center Circles LLC to extend time to answer and time to make mandatory disclosures, filed by Racer Properties LLC, Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#53

(#58) TEXT ORDER: approving the #51 , #53 , #55 and #57 Stipulations. The time for defendants Jagar Enterprises, Inc., Chrysler Group LLC, Center Circles LLC and Thompson Corners, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 4/1/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/20/2018. (nmk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#51

(#58) TEXT ORDER: approving the #51 , #53 , #55 and #57 Stipulations. The time for defendants Jagar Enterprises, Inc., Chrysler Group LLC, Center Circles LLC and Thompson Corners, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 4/1/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/20/2018. (nmk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

1 #11

Exhibit(s) K

1 #10

Exhibit(s) J

1 #7

Exhibit(s) G

1 #6

Exhibit(s) F

1 #5

Exhibit(s) E

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) STIPULATION executed by Telesector Resources Group, Inc. to extend time to answer and time to make mandatory disclosures by Racer Properties LLC, Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Tantillo, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) TEXT ORDER: approving the #61 Stipulation. The time for defendant Deere & Company to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 4/1/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/21/2018. (nmk) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) STIPULATION executed by Deere & Company to extend time to answer and time to make mandatory disclosures, filed by Racer Properties LLC, Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust, Racer Properties LLC. Deere & Company waiver sent on 11/9/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Filling Order Libbey Glass Inc. served on Lynanne Gares on 12/20/2018, filed by Racer Properties LLC, Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) TEXT ORDER: approving the #51 , #53 , #55 and #57 Stipulations. The time for defendants Jagar Enterprises, Inc., Chrysler Group LLC, Center Circles LLC and Thompson Corners, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 4/1/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/20/2018. (nmk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) STIPULATION executed by Thompson Corners, LLC to extend time to answer and time to make mandatory disclosures, filed by Racer Properties LLC, Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust, Racer Properties LLC. Thompson Corners, LLC waiver sent on 11/9/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) STIPULATION executed by Center Circles LLC to extend time to answer and time to make mandatory disclosures, filed by Racer Properties LLC, Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust, Racer Properties LLC. Center Circles LLC waiver sent on 11/9/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust, Racer Properties LLC. Carlyle Air Conditioning Company Inc waiver sent on 11/9/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Knauf, Alan) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Grid USA, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation re #7 Notice of Appearance (Hennessey, Yvonne) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne E. Hennessey on behalf of National Grid USA, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation (Hennessey, Yvonne) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R Tantillo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tantillo, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy K. Kendall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kendall, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust; Attorney Jonathan Tantillo,. Phone number is 585-546-8430. Served by mail. Admissions due by 11/13/2018. (jdp, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/30/2018) (jdp, ). (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Does in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (jdp, ) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 11:30 AM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/22/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, ) Modified on 10/30/2018 (jdp, ). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons)(jdp, ) (Attachment 17 replaced on 10/30/2018) (jdp, ). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4549671) filed by Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response, Racer Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, ) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Libbey Glass Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Niagara Mohawk Power Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where LENNOX INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CARRIER CORPORATION is a litigant