This case was last updated from PACER on 01/28/2019 at 08:14:59 (UTC).

Retro Television, Inc. v. WPVN Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 Retro Television, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WPVN Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00291

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Retro Television, Inc.

Defendant

WPVN Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William H Horton

Attorney at Horton, Ballard & Pemerton, PLLC

James Building, 735 Broad Street, Suite 306

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Defendant Attorneys

C Crews Townsend

Attorney at Miller & Martin

832 Georgia Avenue, Suite 1000 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402-2289

Jon M Talotta

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP (VA)

7930 Jones Branch Drive, Ninth Floor

Mclean, VA 22102

Megan Welton

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC (Chattanooga)

832 Georgia Avenue, 1200 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal case with Prejudice by WPVN Holdings, LLC. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/21/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by WPVN Holdings, LLC. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

10 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#10

(#10) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/6/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (aws, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Answer by WPVN Holdings, LLC. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 455, the Honorable Susan K. Lee, United States Magistrate Judge, has recused herself in this cause. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Christopher H. Steger, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/3/18. (ABF) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/03/2018. (KRS, ) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Jon Talotta. Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (JBR) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/18. (JBR) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/18. (JBR) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/18. (JBR) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by WPVN Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Polnet Communications, Ltd., Corporate Parent U.S. Buyer Broadcasting, LLC for WPVN Holdings, LLC. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Chancery Court, case number 18c1173. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3828289), filed by WPVN Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Townsend, C) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal case with Prejudice by WPVN Holdings, LLC. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/21/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by WPVN Holdings, LLC. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/6/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (aws, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Answer by WPVN Holdings, LLC. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 455, the Honorable Susan K. Lee, United States Magistrate Judge, has recused herself in this cause. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Christopher H. Steger, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/3/18. (ABF) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/03/2018. (KRS, ) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Jon Talotta. Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (JBR) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/18. (JBR) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/18. (JBR) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/18. (JBR) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JBR) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by WPVN Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Polnet Communications, Ltd., Corporate Parent U.S. Buyer Broadcasting, LLC for WPVN Holdings, LLC. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Chancery Court, case number 18c1173. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3828289), filed by WPVN Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Townsend, C) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.