This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2018 at 08:01:55 (UTC).

Renovales v. National Credit Adjusters, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 Renovales filed an Other lawsuit against National Credit Adjusters, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Aleta A. Trauger, Joe Brown and Eli J. Richardson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01122

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joe Brown

Presiding Judges

Aleta A. Trauger

Eli J. Richardson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Magaly Renovales

Defendant

National Credit Adjusters, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mary E. Philipps

Attorney at Philipps & Philipps, Ltd.

9760 S. Roberts Road, Suite One

Palos Hills, IL 60465

Cynthia T. Lawson

Attorney at Bond, Botes & Lawson, P.C.

6704 Watermour Way

Knoxville, TN 37912

David J. Philipps

Attorney at Philipps & Philipps, Ltd.

9760 S. Roberts Road, Suite One

Palos Hills, IL 60465

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel has notified the Magistrate Judge's chambers that this matter has settled. By January 14, 2019, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or other closing document. Accordingly, the Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for December 17, 2018, is hereby CANCELED. The Clerk is directed to forward the file to the District Judge for his consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/31/2018. (am) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (am) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/26/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Eli J. Richardson for all further proceedings. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/24/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#9

(#9) Summons issued as to National Credit Adjusters, LLC. (Attorney David J. Philipps sent service packets by regular mail.) (am) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/18/2018) (am). Modified Date on 10/18/2018 (am). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/17/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

7 #1

Attachment E.D. TN Letters of Good Standing

#7

(#7) MOTION for attorney(s) David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2776621) by Magaly Renovales. (Attachments: #1 Attachment E.D. TN Letters of Good Standing)(Philipps, David) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#3

(#3) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Magaly Renovales. (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia T. Lawson on behalf of Magaly Renovales (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

1 #6

Exhibit E - Collection Letters

1 #5

Exhibit D - Agreed Payment Plan

1 #4

Exhibit C - LACD July 12, 2018 Letter

1 #3

Exhibit B - Tennessee Licensure Information

1 #2

Exhibit A - Tennessee Secretary of State Corporate Information

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel has notified the Magistrate Judge's chambers that this matter has settled. By January 14, 2019, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or other closing document. Accordingly, the Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for December 17, 2018, is hereby CANCELED. The Clerk is directed to forward the file to the District Judge for his consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/31/2018. (am) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (am) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/26/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Eli J. Richardson for all further proceedings. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/24/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons issued as to National Credit Adjusters, LLC. (Attorney David J. Philipps sent service packets by regular mail.) (am) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/18/2018) (am). Modified Date on 10/18/2018 (am). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/17/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for attorney(s) David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2776621) by Magaly Renovales. (Attachments: #1 Attachment E.D. TN Letters of Good Standing)(Philipps, David) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL David J. Philipps, Mary E. Philipps: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/7/2018. (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • TN & IL State Bar status verified as active for David J. Philipps, Mary E. Philipps. (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Magaly Renovales. (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia T. Lawson on behalf of Magaly Renovales (am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against National Credit Adjusters, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2776031), filed by Magaly Renovales. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Tennessee Secretary of State Corporate Information, #3 Exhibit B - Tennessee Licensure Information, #4 Exhibit C - LACD July 12, 2018 Letter, #5 Exhibit D - Agreed Payment Plan, #6 Exhibit E - Collection Letters)(am) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.