This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2021 at 02:33:50 (UTC).

Reno-Tahoe Specialty Inc v. Mungchi Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 Reno-Tahoe Specialty Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Mungchi Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. King and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-00663

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. King

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reno-Tahoe Specialty Inc

Defendants and Interested Parties

Mungchi Inc

Ricky Noh

Silla America, Inc.

MC Crew, Ltd.

The Style N, Inc.

I Love P&A, Ltd.

DBDE, Inc.

Kyung Su Lee

Top Design

Not Classified By Court

Michael Chang

Donne Recovery, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

Lawrence C Ecoff

Attorney at Ecoff Campain and Tilles LLP

280 South Beverly Drive Suite 504

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Ginni G Kim

Attorney at Ecoff Campain and Tilles LLP

280 South Beverly Drive Suite 504

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Alberto J Campain

Attorney at Ecoff Campain and Tilles LLP

280 South Beverly Drive Suite 504

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Douglas Chadwick Biggins

Attorney at Biggins Law Group

3701 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 410

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Paul Philip Young

Attorney at Chora Young LLP

2667 East Colorado Boulevard Suite B

Pasadena, CA 91107

Joseph Chora

Attorney at Chora Young LLP

2667 East Colorado Boulevard Suite B

Pasadena, CA 91107

 

Court Documents

#122

(#122) ORDER DENYING JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S MOTION TO ADD MC CREW, LTD. AS A JUDGMENT DEBTOR #118 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Chang's Motion to add MC Crew as a Judgment Debtor is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (iv) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#121

(#121) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING FROM JUNE 15, 2020 TO JUNE 29, 2020 by Chief Judge Cormac J. Carney. Before the Court is Assignee and Judgment Creditor Michael Chang's Motion to Add MC Crew, Ltd. as a Judgment Debtor Because it is a Successor to Mungchi, Inc., filed on May 18, 2020. (Dkt. #118 .) On its own motion, the Court hereby CONTINUES the hearing on the Motion to June 29, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. (lom) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#117

(#117) MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #97 , CCA # 18-56411. The judgment of this Court, entered December 13, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum #116 AFFIRMED.](mat) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#116

(#116) MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #97 filed by Michael Chang. CCA # 18-56411. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (shb) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#111

(#118) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #111 . filed by plaintiff Michael Chang. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge virginia a. phillips. (Attachments: #1 Declaration decl Layton, #2 Declaration decl bank custodians, #3 Declaration decl engel, #4 Declaration decl biggins, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 5-12, #6 Exhibit Exhibits 16-19, #7 Exhibit Exhibits 30-42, #8 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit Exhibits A-D, #10 Proposed Order) (Biggins, Douglas) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#97

(#115) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #97 filed by Michael Chang. CCA # 18-56411. This case shall be submitted on the briefs and record, without oral argument, on December 11, 2019, in Pasadena, California. See Fed. R. App. P. 34(a)(2)(C). (car) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE Judgment in a Civil Case from another District filed by Assignee of Record Donne Recovery, LLC. Judgment entered on 12/24/2014 (Young, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#7

(#7) ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER by Judge George H. King granting #5 REQUEST: NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. Plaintiff, Reno-Tahoe Specialty, Inc.'s request that a registered process server, who is at least 18 years of age, of suitable discretion and not party to the within action, be authorized and appointed to serve the writs in the above case is GRANTED. The U.S. Marshal's office will remain the Levying Officer. (bm) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because subsequent filings have changed the nature of the case. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge George H. King is assigned to this new case number 2:16-cv-00663-GHK. All future documents must be filed under this new case number. The previous case number, 2:14-mc-00241-UA, is hereby terminated. (ghap) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#7) ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER by Judge George H. King granting #5 REQUEST: NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. Plaintiff, Reno-Tahoe Specialty, Inc.'s request that a registered process server, who is at least 18 years of age, of suitable discretion and not party to the within action, be authorized and appointed to serve the writs in the above case is GRANTED. The U.S. Marshal's office will remain the Levying Officer. (bm) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#4

(#4) Acknowledgement of Assigment of Judgment (Young, Paul) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

#3

(#3) ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff Reno-Tahoe Specialty Inc and against Kyung Su Lee, Top Design RE: Certification of Registration of Foreign Judgment (within U.S),, #1 (bp) (Entered: 05/13/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Entered date of Writ/Abstract is incorrect (refer to docket). Entered date is 05/06/2014.. Please return this form with the corrected document when returned to the clerk's office for filing. (bp) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

#1

(#3) ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff Reno-Tahoe Specialty Inc and against Kyung Su Lee, Top Design RE: Certification of Registration of Foreign Judgment (within U.S),, #1 (bp) (Entered: 05/13/2014)

213 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) ORDER DENYING JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S MOTION TO ADD MC CREW, LTD. AS A JUDGMENT DEBTOR #118 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Chang's Motion to add MC Crew as a Judgment Debtor is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (iv) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING FROM JUNE 15, 2020 TO JUNE 29, 2020 by Chief Judge Cormac J. Carney. Before the Court is Assignee and Judgment Creditor Michael Chang's Motion to Add MC Crew, Ltd. as a Judgment Debtor Because it is a Successor to Mungchi, Inc., filed on May 18, 2020. (Dkt. #118 .) On its own motion, the Court hereby CONTINUES the hearing on the Motion to June 29, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. (lom) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #111 . #118 filed by Creditor Michael Chang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl Biggins, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 44, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 45, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 46, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 47, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 48, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 49, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 50, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 51, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 52)(Biggins, Douglas) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #111 . #118 filed by Interested Party MC Crew, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ricky Noh, #2 Declaration of Taek Yoon, #3 Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Chad Biggins, #4 Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Jason Engel, #5 Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Caitlin Layton)(Ecoff, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #111 . filed by plaintiff Michael Chang. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge virginia a. phillips. (Attachments: #1 Declaration decl Layton, #2 Declaration decl bank custodians, #3 Declaration decl engel, #4 Declaration decl biggins, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 5-12, #6 Exhibit Exhibits 16-19, #7 Exhibit Exhibits 30-42, #8 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit Exhibits A-D, #10 Proposed Order) (Biggins, Douglas) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #97 , CCA # 18-56411. The judgment of this Court, entered December 13, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum #116 AFFIRMED.](mat) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #97 filed by Michael Chang. CCA # 18-56411. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (shb) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #97 filed by Michael Chang. CCA # 18-56411. This case shall be submitted on the briefs and record, without oral argument, on December 11, 2019, in Pasadena, California. See Fed. R. App. P. 34(a)(2)(C). (car) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) **STRICKEN** ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Miscellaneous Document #112 , for the following reasons: Request for Costs and/or attorney fees improperly made. Counsel must comport to the Local Rules for the Central District of California, applicable general orders and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.; (yl) Modified on 9/26/2019 (yl). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) OBJECTIONS to Miscellaneous Document #112 Memorandum of Costs Submitted by Assignee of Record Michael Chang filed by Defendant Mungchi Inc. (Ecoff, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Other: 1) The amount listed in the Affidavit (CV-24) does not coincide with the amount in the judgment. 2) The amount listed in the Writ (CV-23) should be reflected as "Attorney Fees and Cost." 3) The case number in the Writ (CV-23) should reflect 2:16-cv-00663-GHK. Please return this form with the corrected document when returned to the clerk's office for filing. (bm) (Entered: 05/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE Judgment for Attorney's Fees in a Civil Case from another District filed by Assignee of Record Donne Recovery, LLC. Judgment entered 3/26/2015 (Young, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE Judgment in a Civil Case from another District filed by Assignee of Record Donne Recovery, LLC. Judgment entered on 12/24/2014 (Young, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER by Judge George H. King granting #5 REQUEST: NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. Plaintiff, Reno-Tahoe Specialty, Inc.'s request that a registered process server, who is at least 18 years of age, of suitable discretion and not party to the within action, be authorized and appointed to serve the writs in the above case is GRANTED. The U.S. Marshal's office will remain the Levying Officer. (bm) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because subsequent filings have changed the nature of the case. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge George H. King is assigned to this new case number 2:16-cv-00663-GHK. All future documents must be filed under this new case number. The previous case number, 2:14-mc-00241-UA, is hereby terminated. (ghap) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First REQUEST for Order for Service by Registered Process Server Donne Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Paul Philip Young added to party Donne Recovery, LLC(pty:cr)) (Young, Paul) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Acknowledgement of Assigment of Judgment (Young, Paul) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff Reno-Tahoe Specialty Inc and against Kyung Su Lee, Top Design RE: Certification of Registration of Foreign Judgment (within U.S),, #1 (bp) (Entered: 05/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Entered date of Writ/Abstract is incorrect (refer to docket). Entered date is 05/06/2014.. Please return this form with the corrected document when returned to the clerk's office for filing. (bp) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CERTIFICATION OF JUDGMENT OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT received from USDC for the District of Nevada, case number 2:12-cv-01051-GMN-VCF, Final Judgment on Default and Permanent Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Top Design and Kyung Su Lee, jointly and severally, pay Plaintiff statutory damages of $50,000.00 for the their willful copyright infrigement, etc., entered in the sending district on 12/10/2013. Entered in this district on 5/6/2014., filed by Plaintiff Reno-Tahoe Specialty Inc. MD JS-Case Terminated. (et) (Entered: 05/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mungchi Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Silla America, Inc. is a litigant