This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2019 at 20:29:01 (UTC).

Reilly, Jennifer v. Badger Coaches, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 Reilly, Jennifer filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Badger Coaches, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00198

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly

Defendants

Badger Coaches, Inc.

John Meier

David Meier

James Meier

Badger Tour & Travel, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leslie Burns

Attorney at Burns the Attorney

Po Box 635247

San Diego, CA 92163

Carolyn Esther Wright

Attorney at Law Office of Carolyn E. Wright

Po Box 430

Glenbrook, NV 89413

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Dean Wolske

Attorney at Menn Law Firm, Ltd.

2501 East Enterprise Avenue, P.O. Box 785

Appleton, WI 54912-0785

Crystal N Abbey

Attorney at Menn Law Firm, Ltd

2501 E. Enterprise Ave, Po Box 785

Appleton, WI 54912-0785

 

Court Documents

114 #1

Text Order Dismissing Case

#114

(#114) Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Text Order Dismissing Case) (kwf) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#111

(#111) Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly. (Burns, Leslie) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

108 #1

Exhibit A -- Revised Invoice for Costs re: Motion to Compel

#108

(#108) Declaration of Attorney Crystal N. Abbey regarding Fees and Costs Awarded from Court's May 31, 2019 Decision and Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel re: Issue being briefed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Revised Invoice for Costs re: Motion to Compel) (Abbey, Crystal) Modified on 6/18/2019: Linked to pending motion. (kwf) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#106

(#106) Objection to Bill of Costs by Plaintiff Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly re: Briefing set re: Itemized List of Expenses related to opposing Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Burns, Leslie) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

105 #1

Exhibit A - Statement of Actual, Reasonable Attorneys' Fees

#105

(#109) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On May 31, 2019, this court denied plaintiff's motion to compel and granted defendants' request for cost-shifting under Rule 37(a)(5). See dkt. #104 . Defendants submitted an itemization of costs totaling $2559.60 (dkt. #105 -1) which they subsequently reduced to $2445.90 (dkt. #108 -1). This is based on a total of 15 hours of attorney time at rates of $160/hr and $177/hr. Plaintiff challenges the activities on which defendants' attorneys spent the time they are claiming, arguing that only $1355.90 of defendants' claim is compensable (dkt. #106 ). Having reviewed each entry on defendants' revised billing sheet, I will give plaintiff the benefit of the doubt and strike the first three entries totaling $115.40. The remaining work is sufficiently related to the dispute that resulted in plaintiff's motion to be compensable. The amount of time spent and the hourly rates charged all are reasonable. Therefore, it is ORDERED that plaintiff and her attorney are jointly and severally liable to pay $2330.50 to defendants' attorneys not later than July 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/19/2019. (kwf) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#104

(#109) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On May 31, 2019, this court denied plaintiff's motion to compel and granted defendants' request for cost-shifting under Rule 37(a)(5). See dkt. #104 . Defendants submitted an itemization of costs totaling $2559.60 (dkt. #105 -1) which they subsequently reduced to $2445.90 (dkt. #108 -1). This is based on a total of 15 hours of attorney time at rates of $160/hr and $177/hr. Plaintiff challenges the activities on which defendants' attorneys spent the time they are claiming, arguing that only $1355.90 of defendants' claim is compensable (dkt. #106 ). Having reviewed each entry on defendants' revised billing sheet, I will give plaintiff the benefit of the doubt and strike the first three entries totaling $115.40. The remaining work is sufficiently related to the dispute that resulted in plaintiff's motion to be compensable. The amount of time spent and the hourly rates charged all are reasonable. Therefore, it is ORDERED that plaintiff and her attorney are jointly and severally liable to pay $2330.50 to defendants' attorneys not later than July 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/19/2019. (kwf) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (kwf) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

1 #7

Summons - D. Meier

1 #6

Summons - J. Meier

1 #5

Summons - Badger Coaches

1 #4

Report on Filing Copyright Action

1 #3

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Badger Site Screenshots

1 #1

Exhibit A - Reilly Sites Screenshots

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2214023.), filed by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reilly Sites Screenshots, #2 Exhibit B - Badger Site Screenshots, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Report on Filing Copyright Action, #5 Summons - Badger Coaches, #6 Summons - J. Meier, #7 Summons - D. Meier) (Burns, Leslie) Modified on 3/21/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

198 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Text Order Dismissing Case) (kwf) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#113) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Having been advised that the parties have settled this case, this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Any party may move to dismiss with prejudice or to reopen for good cause shown. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/23/2019. (kwf) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#112) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court is in receipt of a notice by plaintiff, informing the court that the parties have "agreed in principle to settle all claims in this matter." (Dkt. #111 .) In light of this notice, the court will provide the parties until Monday, August 26, 2019, to inform the court whether they authorize an order dismissing this case without prejudice and allowing any party to move to dismiss with prejudice or to reopen for good cause shown. If the parties cannot agreed to this dismissal order or some form of a definitive, joint settlement agreement, then the court will issue its opinion and order on the parties' motions for summary judgment. Until then, the pretrial deadlines and trial date remain in place. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/23/2019. (kwf) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#111) Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly. (Burns, Leslie) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • (#110) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **This case is set for a trial commencing October 7, 2019, with motions in limine and other pretrial submissions due tomorrow, August 23. The parties' cross-motions for summary judgment are pending. The court expects to issue an opinion late today or tomorrow on those motions, with the result being that a trial on some claims against the corporate defendants will be necessary. In light of the impending deadlines, the court will amend the pretrial schedule to provide the parties with time to digest the summary judgment opinion before submitting their motions in limine and initial pretrial submissions. As such, those submissions are now due August 30, 2019, with responses due September 13, 2019. The final pretrial conference and trial dates remain the same. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/22/2019. (kwf) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On May 31, 2019, this court denied plaintiff's motion to compel and granted defendants' request for cost-shifting under Rule 37(a)(5). See dkt. #104 . Defendants submitted an itemization of costs totaling $2559.60 (dkt. #105 -1) which they subsequently reduced to $2445.90 (dkt. #108 -1). This is based on a total of 15 hours of attorney time at rates of $160/hr and $177/hr. Plaintiff challenges the activities on which defendants' attorneys spent the time they are claiming, arguing that only $1355.90 of defendants' claim is compensable (dkt. #106 ). Having reviewed each entry on defendants' revised billing sheet, I will give plaintiff the benefit of the doubt and strike the first three entries totaling $115.40. The remaining work is sufficiently related to the dispute that resulted in plaintiff's motion to be compensable. The amount of time spent and the hourly rates charged all are reasonable. Therefore, it is ORDERED that plaintiff and her attorney are jointly and severally liable to pay $2330.50 to defendants' attorneys not later than July 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/19/2019. (kwf) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) Declaration of Attorney Crystal N. Abbey regarding Fees and Costs Awarded from Court's May 31, 2019 Decision and Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel re: Issue being briefed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Revised Invoice for Costs re: Motion to Compel) (Abbey, Crystal) Modified on 6/18/2019: Linked to pending motion. (kwf) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) Declaration of Carolyn E. Wright filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly in support of Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Request for Expenses re: Issue being briefed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: April 5 2019 Email between counsels) (Burns, Leslie) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) Objection to Bill of Costs by Plaintiff Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly re: Briefing set re: Itemized List of Expenses related to opposing Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Burns, Leslie) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Itemized List of Expenses. (kwf) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Badger Coaches, Inc., John Meier, David Meier. (Wolske, Christopher) Modified on 4/16/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant John Meier. John Meier waiver sent on 4/9/2018, answer due 6/8/2018. (Burns, Leslie) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant David Meier. David Meier waiver sent on 4/9/2018, answer due 6/8/2018. (Burns, Leslie) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Badger Coaches, Inc. Badger Coaches, Inc. waiver sent on 4/9/2018, answer due 6/8/2018. (Burns, Leslie) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher Dean Wolske for Defendants Badger Coaches, Inc., David Meier, John Meier. (Wolske, Christopher) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Badger Coaches, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to John Meier, #2 Summons Issued as to David Meier) (kwf) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (kwf) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2214023.), filed by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reilly Sites Screenshots, #2 Exhibit B - Badger Site Screenshots, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Report on Filing Copyright Action, #5 Summons - Badger Coaches, #6 Summons - J. Meier, #7 Summons - D. Meier) (Burns, Leslie) Modified on 3/21/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less