This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2019 at 07:34:08 (UTC).

REICHARD v. MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 REICHARD filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Paradise Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00349

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Paradise Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANICE A. REICHARD

Defendants

JAMES BOCK

JOHN GROH

JOHN MORGAN

MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A. Markham

Attorney at Elderkin, Martin, Kelly & Messina

150 East Eighth Street

Erie, PA 16501-1819

Defendant Attorney

G. Jay Habas

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

717 State Street, Suite 701

Erie, PA 16501

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Mediation Article

#12

(#12) ORDER re: Mediation Article. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/18/18. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Article) (lrw) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#11

(#11) INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management set for 1/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room A-280, U.S. District Court, 17 South Park Row, Erie, PA before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 1/3/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/18/18. (lrw) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER on civil motion practice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/18/18. (lrw) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JAMES BOCK, JOHN GROH, MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP, JOHN MORGAN. (Habas, G.) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by JAMES BOCK, JOHN GROH, MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP, JOHN MORGAN Answer due from All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Habas, G.) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by G. Jay Habas on behalf of JAMES BOCK, JOHN GROH, MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP, JOHN MORGAN. (Habas, G.) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

6 #1

Affidavit Service James Bock

#6

(#6) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JANICE A. REICHARD. JAMES BOCK served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service James Bock) (Markham, Craig) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

5 #1

Affidavit Service John Morgan

#5

(#5) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JANICE A. REICHARD. JOHN MORGAN served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service John Morgan) (Markham, Craig) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

4 #1

Affidavit Service John Groh

#4

(#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JANICE A. REICHARD. JOHN GROH served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service John Groh) (Markham, Craig) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

3 #1

Affidavit Service Millcreek Township

#3

(#3) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JANICE A. REICHARD. MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service Millcreek Township) (Markham, Craig) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JAMES BOCK, JOHN GROH, MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP, JOHN MORGAN (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4920362), filed by JANICE REICHARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER re: Mediation Article. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/18/18. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Article) (lrw) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management set for 1/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room A-280, U.S. District Court, 17 South Park Row, Erie, PA before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 1/3/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/18/18. (lrw) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STANDING ORDER on civil motion practice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/18/18. (lrw) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JAMES BOCK, JOHN GROH, MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP, JOHN MORGAN. (Habas, G.) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by JAMES BOCK, JOHN GROH, MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP, JOHN MORGAN Answer due from All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Habas, G.) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by G. Jay Habas on behalf of JAMES BOCK, JOHN GROH, MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP, JOHN MORGAN. (Habas, G.) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JANICE A. REICHARD. JAMES BOCK served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service James Bock) (Markham, Craig) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JANICE A. REICHARD. JOHN MORGAN served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service John Morgan) (Markham, Craig) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JANICE A. REICHARD. JOHN GROH served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service John Groh) (Markham, Craig) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JANICE A. REICHARD. MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service Millcreek Township) (Markham, Craig) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to JAMES BOCK, JOHN GROH, MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP, JOHN MORGAN (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (jd) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JAMES BOCK, JOHN GROH, MILLCREEK TOWNSHIP, JOHN MORGAN (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4920362), filed by JANICE REICHARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less