This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2018 at 07:02:40 (UTC).

Regents of the University of Minnesota v. LSI Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2018 Regents of the University of Minnesota filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LSI Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria-Elena James, Edward J. Davila and Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00821

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

Presiding Judges

Maria-Elena James

Edward J. Davila

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Regents of the University of Minnesota

Defendants and Counter Claimants

LSI Corporation

Avago Technologies U.S. Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Mark G. Knedeisen

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

210 Sixth Ave.

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Christopher M. Verdini

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Anna Shabalov

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Brian J Slovut

Attorney at University of Minnesota

200 Oak St Se Ste 360

Mpls, MN 55455-2006

Patrick J. McElhinny

Attorney at Kirkpatrick & Lockhart

1500 Oliver Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2312

Douglas B. Greenswag

Attorney at K & L Gates LLP

925 Fourth Avenue, Suite 2900

Seattle, WA 98104-1158

Theodore J. Angelis

Attorney at Preston Gates & Ellis

925 Fourth Avenue, Suite 2900

Seattle, WA 98104-1158

Carrie Ryan Gallia

Attorney at Lindquist and Vennum PLLP

4200 Ids Center, 80 S. 8Th St.

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Theodore J. Angelis,

Attorney at KL Gates LLP

925 Fourth Avenue, Suite 2900

Seattle, WA 98104-1158

Patrick Joseph McElhinny,

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2312

Christopher Michael Verdini

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Mark G. Knedeisen,

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeffrey R Mulder

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th St., Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jessica L. Klander

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Amie E. Penny Sayler

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

David E. Sipiora

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend and Stackton LLP

1400 Wewatta Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80202-5556

Edward John Mayle

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1400 Wewatta Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80202

Lewis A Remele, Jr

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th Street, Ste 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Scott Kolassa

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1080 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Edward John Mayle,

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend and Stockton LLP

1400 Wewatta Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80202

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

199 #6

Exhibit 1

199 #5

Declaration Declaration of Edward J. Mayle ISO Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Suppl

199 #4

*Restricted*

199 #3

REDACTED Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Supplementa

199 #2

Proposed Order

199 #1

Declaration Declaration of Edward J. Mayle in Support of Administrative Motion t

#199

(#199) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unopposed Administrative Motion to Seal Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Supplemental Infringement Contentions filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc, LSI Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Edward J. Mayle in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Supplemental Infringement Contentions, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Infringement Contentions, #4 SEALED Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Infringement Contentions, #5 Declaration Declaration of Edward J. Mayle ISO Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Infringement Contentions, #6 Exhibit 1)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 3/28/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

#129

***Set/Reset Deadlines per ECF #196 Order as to #129 Motion to Strike Pleading Plaintiff's Supplemental Claim Construction Charts. Replies due by 3/28/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

#116

(#200) CLERK'S NOTICE: In light of the pending motion to stay and motion to dismiss before the trial court judge, the court continues the motion hearing on the motion to compel #116 and the motion to strike #129 to 6/13/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit(s) 8

1 #7

Exhibit(s) 7

1 #5

Exhibit(s) 5

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 4

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 3

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#1

(#3) NOTICE by University of Minnesota Regents re #1 Complaint, Report [to USPTO] on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent (Slovut, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2016)

384 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#200) CLERK'S NOTICE: In light of the pending motion to stay and motion to dismiss before the trial court judge, the court continues the motion hearing on the motion to compel #116 and the motion to strike #129 to 6/13/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#199) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unopposed Administrative Motion to Seal Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Supplemental Infringement Contentions filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc, LSI Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Edward J. Mayle in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Supplemental Infringement Contentions, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Infringement Contentions, #4 SEALED Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Infringement Contentions, #5 Declaration Declaration of Edward J. Mayle ISO Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Infringement Contentions, #6 Exhibit 1)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 3/28/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#198) REPLY (re #129 MOTION to Strike Pleading Plaintiff's Supplemental Claim Construction Charts ) Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Infringement Contentions filed byAvago Technologies U.S. Inc, LSI Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Edward J. Mayle ISO Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Infringement Contentions, #2 Exhibit 1)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 3/28/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Set/Reset Hearing per ECF #197 Order. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/12/2018 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 7/12/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#197) ORDER GRANTING #195 STIPULATION UNDER CIVIL L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/22/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Set/Reset Deadlines per ECF #196 Order as to #129 Motion to Strike Pleading Plaintiff's Supplemental Claim Construction Charts. Replies due by 3/28/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Set/Reset Deadlines per ECF #196 Order as to #191 Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. Opposition due by 4/9/2018. Replies due by 4/27/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#196) ORDER granting #192 Stipulation to Enlarge Time for Briefing on Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. 190), Motion to Stay (Dkt. 191), and Motion to Strike (Dkt. 174). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/21/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#195) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #186 Case Management Scheduling Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, Stipulation Under Civil L.R. 6-2 filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc, LSI Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Edward J. Mayle in Support of Stipulation Under Civil L.R. 6-2, #2 Proposed Order)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 3/21/2018) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#194) ORDER Granting #193 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Theodore J. Angelis, Counsel for Regents of the University of Minnesota. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/21/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
185 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regents of the University of Minnesota. LSI Corporation served on 8/29/2016, answer due 9/19/2016. (Slovut, Brian) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FILED IN ERROR: REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Avago Technologies U.S. Inc. on 8/29/16, filed by Regents of the University of Minnesota. (Slovut, Brian) Modified on 8/30/2016 (kt). (Entered: 08/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FILED IN ERROR: REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on LSI Corporation on 8/29/16, filed by Regents of the University of Minnesota. (Slovut, Brian) Modified on 8/30/2016 (kt). (Entered: 08/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers. (TJB) (Entered: 08/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • (#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Patrick J. McElhinny, Mark G. Knedeisen, Christopher M. Verdini, Douglas B. Greenswag, Theodore J. Angelis as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) (Entered: 08/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., LSI Corporation. (kt) (Entered: 08/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Patent List and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 16-cv-2891 WMW/SER. (kt) (Entered: 08/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by University of Minnesota Regents re #1 Complaint, Report [to USPTO] on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent (Slovut, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff University of Minnesota Regents. (Slovut, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5078735.) Filed by University of Minnesota Regents. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Slovut, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LSI is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lewis A. Remele, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica L. Klander