This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2018 at 07:18:06 (UTC).

Redrick et al v. City of Akron, Ohio et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 Redrick filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Akron, Ohio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-02523

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jamon Pruiett

Latrent Redrick

Defendants

City of Akron, Ohio

Scott Lietke

Utomhin Okoh

John Turnure

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah J. Gelsomino

Attorney at Friedman & Gilbert

55 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44113

Terry H. Gilbert

Attorney at Friedman & Gilbert

55 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44113

Jacqueline C. Greene

Attorney at Friedman & Gilbert

55 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44113

Sydney Strickland Saffold

Attorney at Saffold Law

1220 West Sixth Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorneys

John C. Reece

Attorney at City of Akron - Civil Division

161 South High Street

Akron, OH 44308

Michael J. Defibaugh

Attorney at City of Akron - Civil Division

161 South High Street

Akron, OH 44308

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Answer filed by All Defendants. (Defibaugh, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

5 #5

Policy and Procedure Manual

5 #4

Budget

5 #3

Consent to Magistrate

5 #2

Rule 30.1

5 #1

Report of Parties

#5

(#5) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 1/10/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams. Lead counsel and party representatives to attend. Judge John R. Adams on 11/18/18. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties, #2 Rule 30.1, #3 Consent to Magistrate, #4 Budget, #5 Policy and Procedure Manual)(K,C) (Entered: 11/18/2018)

#4

(#4) Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 11/29/2018. Judge John R. Adams on 11/5/18.(K,C) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#3

(#3) Motion for extension of time until November 29, 2018 to answer filed by Defendant City of Akron, Ohio, John Turnure, Utomhin Okoh, and Scott Lietke. (Reece, John) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (T,Je) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - summons and complaint

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal from Summit County Common Pleas, case number CV 2018-10-4048 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8988028. Filed by Scott Lietke, City of Akron, Ohio, Utomhin Okoh, John Turnure. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - summons and complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reece, John) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Answer filed by All Defendants. (Defibaugh, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 1/10/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams. Lead counsel and party representatives to attend. Judge John R. Adams on 11/18/18. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties, #2 Rule 30.1, #3 Consent to Magistrate, #4 Budget, #5 Policy and Procedure Manual)(K,C) (Entered: 11/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 11/29/2018. Judge John R. Adams on 11/5/18.(K,C) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion for extension of time until November 29, 2018 to answer filed by Defendant City of Akron, Ohio, John Turnure, Utomhin Okoh, and Scott Lietke. (Reece, John) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (T,Je) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (T,Je) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (T,Je) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal from Summit County Common Pleas, case number CV 2018-10-4048 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8988028. Filed by Scott Lietke, City of Akron, Ohio, Utomhin Okoh, John Turnure. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - summons and complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reece, John) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Defibaugh