This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:17:16 (UTC).

Reddy Raw, Inc. v. C & B Logistics LLC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Reddy Raw, Inc filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against C B Logistics LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07744

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reddy Raw, Inc.

Defendant

C & B LOGISTICS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Courtney Elizabeth Scott

Attorney at Tressler, LLP

One Penn Plaza, Suite 4701

New York, NY 10119

Robert Schiller Crowder

Attorney at Tressler LLP

1901 Ave. Of The Stars, Suite 450

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C & B Logistics LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc.. (Scott, Courtney) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc..(Scott, Courtney) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

8 #1

Certificate of Standing

6 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Standing

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Scott, Courtney) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

8 #2

Affidavit Affidavit

8 #3

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C & B Logistics LLC. (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

6 #3

Text of Proposed Order Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Robert Schiller Crowder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15628715. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Crowder, Robert) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#6

(#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Robert Schiller Crowder to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Crowder, Robert) Modified on 9/12/2018 (wb). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

6 #2

Affidavit Affidavit

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. C & B Logistics LLC served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. Service was accepted by Office of NY Secretary of State by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc.. (Scott, Courtney) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against C & B LOGISTICS LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15492686)Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc..(Scott, Courtney) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Robert Schiller Crowder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15628715. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>/B. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Robert Schiller Crowder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15628715. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Crowder, Robert) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. C & B Logistics LLC served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. Service was accepted by Office of NY Secretary of State by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc.. (Scott, Courtney) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #6 FIRST MOTION for Robert Schiller Crowder to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California; the filing fee was not paid;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Robert Schiller Crowder to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Crowder, Robert) Modified on 9/12/2018 (wb). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C & B Logistics LLC. (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Courtney Elizabeth Scott. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $22,800,000; County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $23,000; the County code has been modified to New York. (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Courtney Elizabeth Scott. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: C & B LOGISTICS LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C & B Logistics LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc.. (Scott, Courtney) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc..(Scott, Courtney) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Scott, Courtney) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against C & B LOGISTICS LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15492686)Document filed by Reddy Raw, Inc..(Scott, Courtney) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.