This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2018 at 07:34:12 (UTC).

Redden v. Sandy et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 Redden filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Sandy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael John Aloi, Irene M. Keeley and Thomas S. Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00187

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael John Aloi

Presiding Judges

Irene M. Keeley

Thomas S. Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronnie D. Redden

Huttonsville, WV 26273

Defendants

Wexford (Medical) Health Sources Inc., Pitt. PA

Doctor Proctor

Doctor Paul

Michael Martin

Kevin C. Halloran

Mrs. Jividen

Jeff Sandy

G. Norman McCann

Kimberly Patten

Micheal Martin

Betsy Jividen

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) RETURN RECEIPT as to #24 #22 #23 Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/16/18. (jss) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

24 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#24

(#24) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Seal is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/15/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd) Modified on 11/19/2018 to correct docket text and regen NEF (cmd). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

23 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#23

(#23) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #20 Second Motion to Appoint Counsel is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/15/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

22 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#22

(#22) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S THIRD MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITS: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #18 Third Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/15/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

20 #1

Envelope

#20

(#20) MOTION for Appointment of Council by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cnd) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#7

(#9) RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/4/18. (jss) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

6 #1

Various documents

#6

(#10) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITS, AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RE-DOCKET THE ATTACHMENTS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS: Plaintiffs motions ECF No. #6 and #8 , construed here as motions to exceed the pagelimits, are GRANTED. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to docket ECF Nos. 6-1, 8-1, 8-2, and 8-3 as attachments to Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/10/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Ronnie D. Redden. (jss) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2018: #2 Various documents, #3 Letter to Ronnie Redden dated 9/27/18 from Disability Rights WV, #4 Letter to plaintiff dated 9/5/18 from Disability Rights WV, #5 Costs Incurred) (jss). Modified on 10/10/2018 (attachments 2, 3, 4 and 5 added per #10 Order. (jss). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2018
  • (#26) Case reassigned to District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh per Order entered 11/30/2018 in case 3:18mc128. Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley no longer assigned to case. There are no hearings scheduled before the District Judge to be reset at this time. Copy of NEF and MC Order to pro se party by regular mail. (cmd) (Entered: 12/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) RETURN RECEIPT as to #24 #22 #23 Orders. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/16/18. (jss) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Seal is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/15/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd) Modified on 11/19/2018 to correct docket text and regen NEF (cmd). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #20 Second Motion to Appoint Counsel is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/15/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S THIRD MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITS: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #18 Third Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/15/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Appointment of Council by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cnd) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Injunction by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cnd) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to File Extended Papers by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cnd) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kevin C. Halloran, Betsy Jividen, Micheal Martin, G. Norman McCann, Kimberly Patten, Paul, Proctor, Jeff Sandy, Wexford (Medical) Health Sources Inc., Pitt. PA, filed by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim, #2 Relief Sought, #3 List of Witnesses, #4 Costs Occured to Plaintiff, #5 Grievance form, #6 Envelope)(cnd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #7 Certificate of Service) (cnd). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RETURN RECEIPT as to #15 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/1/18. (jss) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITS, AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RE-DOCKET THE ATTACHMENTS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS: Plaintiffs motions ECF No. #6 and #8 , construed here as motions to exceed the pagelimits, are GRANTED. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to docket ECF Nos. 6-1, 8-1, 8-2, and 8-3 as attachments to Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/10/18. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/4/18. (jss) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PRO SE MOTION for Leave to File Additional Documents in Support of Claim by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Plaintiff, dated 9/27/18, #2 Letter to Plaintiff, dated 9/5/18, #3 Costs Occured, #4 Envelope)(cnd) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of General Guidelines for appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Various documents)(jss) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Ronnie D. Redden. (jss) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets)(jss) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Ronnie D. Redden. (jss) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie D. Redden. (jss) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2018: #2 Various documents, #3 Letter to Ronnie Redden dated 9/27/18 from Disability Rights WV, #4 Letter to plaintiff dated 9/5/18 from Disability Rights WV, #5 Costs Incurred) (jss). Modified on 10/10/2018 (attachments 2, 3, 4 and 5 added per #10 Order. (jss). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.