This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2019 at 15:15:26 (UTC).

Red Hat, Inc. v. Sequoia Technology, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 Red Hat, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sequoia Technology, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maryellen Noreika, Leonard P. Stark and Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02027

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher J. Burke

Presiding Judges

Maryellen Noreika

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Red Hat, Inc.

International Business Machines Corporations

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Sequoia Technology, LLC

International Business Machines Corporations

Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Susan E. Morrison

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Stephen B. Brauerman

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

John E. Lord

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ANSWER to #21 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Red Hat, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#24

(#24) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Compaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute c/o Seung Chui Sung, Registered Agent on October 2, 2019, filed by Red Hat, Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#23

(#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sequoia Technology, LLC. International Business Machines Corporations served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sequoia Technology, LLC's Disclosures Pursuant to Scheduling Order Paragraph 7(a) filed by Sequoia Technology, LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

21 #2

Exhibit

21 #1

Exhibit

#21

(#21) ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #16 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Red Hat, Inc., International Business Machines Corporations by Sequoia Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

16 #2

Summons Forms - Unsigned

16 #1

Exhibits A-E

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,718,436. (lak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT - filed against Sequoia Technology, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2529349.) - filed by Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ANSWER to #21 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Red Hat, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Compaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute c/o Seung Chui Sung, Registered Agent on October 2, 2019, filed by Red Hat, Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sequoia Technology, LLC. International Business Machines Corporations served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sequoia Technology, LLC's Disclosures Pursuant to Scheduling Order Paragraph 7(a) filed by Sequoia Technology, LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to International Business Machines Corporations on 10/9/2019. (lak) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney John E. Lord for Sequoia Technology, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #16 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Red Hat, Inc., International Business Machines Corporations by Sequoia Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01127-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-01128-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-01129-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-01307-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-02027-LPS-CJB(cak) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Cases associated with lead case 18-1127. All future documents shall be filed in the lead case only. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/24/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01128-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-01129-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-01307-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-02027-LPS-CJB(dlb) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#20) ORAL ORDER: In light of the parties' joint letter of September 13, 2019, (D.I. 15), it is hereby ORDERED that this action be consolidated for all pretrial purposes with Associated Cases: Civil Action No. 18-1127-LPS-CJB, 18-1128-LPS-CJB, 18-1129-LPS-CJB, and 18-1307-LPS-CJB. Civil Action No. 18-1127-LPS-CJB has been designated as the lead case. All future documents shall be filed in the lead case only. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/24/2019. (dlb) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sequoia Technology, LLC on 8/2/2019. (kmd) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Supplemental Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate IBM Corporation for Red Hat, Inc. filed by Red Hat, Inc.. (Morrison, Susan) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #5 Stipulation. CASE STAYED. See Stipulation for details. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/14/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint STIPULATION staying litigation by Red Hat, Inc.. (Morrison, Susan) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • No Summons Issued. (lak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for Red Hat, Inc. filed by Red Hat, Inc.. (lak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,718,436. (lak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT - filed against Sequoia Technology, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2529349.) - filed by Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sequoia Technology, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Red Hat, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan E. Morrison