This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:52:11 (UTC).

Realtime Data LLC v. Veritas Technologies LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Realtime Data LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Veritas Technologies LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and Susan Illston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-06029

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Realtime Data LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Veritas Technologies LLC

CenturyLink, Inc.

CenturyLink Communications, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brian David Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao

Attorney at Zhong Lun Law Firm LLP

4322 Wilshire Blvd Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Thomas John Ward, Jr.

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

1127 Judson Road, Suite 220

Longview, TX 75601

C. Jay Chung

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul Anthony Kroeger

Attorney at Russ, August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Nancy Claire Abernathy

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

1127 Judson Road, Ste 220

Longview, TX 75601-5157

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Alan Fenster

Attorney at Attorney at Law

9777 Wilshire Blvd #900

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Alan Michael Billharz

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

650 Town Center Drive, 20Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1925

Eric Hugh Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N College Avenue, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Aichi H Nguyen

Amit Makker

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Roger Brian Craft

Attorney at Findlay Craft

6760 Old Jacksonville Hwy, Suite 101

Tyler, TX 75703

Andrew John Fossum

3212 Pearce Road

Austin, TX 78730

Daniel Makoto Radke

Tensegrity Law Group Llp, 555 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 650

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Andrew John Willis

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1259 W Capitol Dr Unit 128

San Pedro, CA 90732

Douglas L. Sawyer

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

131 South Dearborn Street, 17Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60603

Kourtney Mueller Merrill

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP-Denver

1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite 1400

Denver, CO 80202-5255

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Exhibit D - '908 Patent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CenturyLink, Inc., Veritas Technologies LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5633537.), filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - '506 Patent, #3 Exhibit B - '728 Patent, #4 Exhibit C - '513 Patent, #5 Exhibit D - '908 Patent)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

1 #3

Exhibit B - '728 Patent

1 #4

Exhibit C - '513 Patent

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - '506 Patent

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D Ledahl on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Ledahl, Brian) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Liao, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Realtime Data LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

9 #1

Summons(es)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Issued as to CenturyLink, Inc., Veritas Technologies LLC, and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(mll, ) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#158

(#158) CLERK'S NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the order of referral and determined that this case is not related to 17-cv-02109-SK. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#157

(#157) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CenturyLink Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CenturyLink, Inc. for CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Merrill, Kourtney) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#156

(#156) Certificate of Interested Entities by CenturyLink Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CenturyLink, Inc. for CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Merrill, Kourtney) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

322 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#158) CLERK'S NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the order of referral and determined that this case is not related to 17-cv-02109-SK. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • 11/30/18 CMC vacated pending related case determination. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018) Modified on 11/27/2018 (tfS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#157) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CenturyLink Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CenturyLink, Inc. for CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Merrill, Kourtney) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#156) Certificate of Interested Entities by CenturyLink Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CenturyLink, Inc. for CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Merrill, Kourtney) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#155) ORDER OF REFERRAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#154) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Veritas Technologies LLC. (Nguyen, Lisa) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/23/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#153) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Yeh on behalf of Veritas Technologies, LLC (Yeh, Thomas) (Filed on 11/21/2018) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#152) NOTICE of Appearance by Amit Makker on behalf of Veritas Technologies, LLC (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 11/21/2018) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#151) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chung, Jay) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#150) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by CenturyLink Communications, LLC (Merrill, Kourtney) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
150 More Docket Entries
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued as to CenturyLink, Inc., Veritas Technologies LLC, and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(mll, ) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Realtime Data LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Liao, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D Ledahl on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Ledahl, Brian) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CenturyLink, Inc., Veritas Technologies LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5633537.), filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - '506 Patent, #3 Exhibit B - '728 Patent, #4 Exhibit C - '513 Patent, #5 Exhibit D - '908 Patent)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.