This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2018 at 11:35:53 (UTC).

Realtime Adaptive Streaming v. Adobe Systems Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2018 Realtime Adaptive Streaming filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Adobe Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-10355

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Realtime Adaptive Streaming

Defendant

Adobe Systems Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David S. Godkin

Attorney at Birnbaum & Godkin, LLP

280 Summer Street

Boston, MA 02210

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

C. Jay Chung

Attorney at RUSS AUGUST & KABAT

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

124244 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 12

Los Angeles, CA 90025-9002

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at RUSS AUGUST & KABAT

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Timothy T. Hsieh

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James E. Kruzer

Attorney at Birnbaum & Godkin, LLP

280 Summer Street, 5Th Floor

Boston, MA 02210

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth G.H. Ranks

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C. (Bos)

One Marina Park Drive

Boston, MA 02210-1878

Frank E. Scherkenbach

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C. (Bos)

One Marina Park Drive

Boston, MA 02210-1878

 

Court Documents

#17

#15

#14

#13

12 #4

Exhibit B

12 #3

Exhibit A

12 #2

Memorandum in support of Motion

12 #1

Motion for MDL

1 #9

Category Sheet

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Filing with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, a Motion to Transfer to the District of Colorado by Realtime Adaptive Streaming. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Adobe Systems Inc. answer/response due on or before 5/18/2018. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to May 18, 2018 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Adobe Systems Inc..(Ranks, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth G.H. Ranks on behalf of Adobe Systems Inc. (Ranks, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank E. Scherkenbach on behalf of Adobe Systems Inc. (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Realtime Adaptive Streaming OF FILING MOTION TO TRANSFER BEFORE THE U.S. JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (Attachments: #1 Motion for MDL, #2 Memorandum in support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proof of Service)(Chung, C.) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Adobe Systems Inc. Answer/ Response due 4/19/2018. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to April 19, 2018 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Realtime Adaptive Streaming.(Kruzer, James) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Adobe Systems Inc. served on 2/27/2018, answer due 3/20/2018. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Marc A. Fenster, Reza Mirzaie, Brian D. Ledahl, C.Jay Chung, Philip X. Wang and Timothy T. Hsieh. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marc A. Fenster, Reza Mirzaie, Brian D. Ledahl, C.Jay Chung, Philip X. Wang and Timothy T. Hsieh Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-7027569 by Realtime Adaptive Streaming. (Attachments: #1 Fenster Certificate, #2 Mirzaie Certificate, #3 Ledahl Certificate, #4 Chung Certificate, #5 Wang Certificate, #6 Hsieh Certificate)(Kruzer, James) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Kruzer on behalf of Realtime Adaptive Streaming (Kruzer, James) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Adobe Systems Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 Page 2)(Godkin, David) (Main Document 3 and Attachment 1 replaced on 2/26/2018 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina). (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Realtime Adaptive Streaming identifying Corporate Parent Realtime Data LLC for Realtime Adaptive Streaming.. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Adobe Systems Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7022875 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet)(Godkin, David) (Attachment 8 & 9 replaced on 2/26/2018 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina). (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adobe Systems Inc. 401(k) Retirement Savings Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy T. Hsieh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James E. Kruzer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David S. Godkin