This case was last updated from PACER on 06/27/2019 at 19:33:03 (UTC).

Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC v. Haivision Network Video Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Haivision Network Video Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sherry R. Fallon and Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-01520

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sherry R. Fallon

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC

Defendants

Haivision Network Video Corp.

Haivision Network Video Inc.

Haivision KB Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen B. Brauerman

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Sara E. Bussiere

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Reza Mirzaie

Philip X. Wang

C. Jay Chung

Brian D. Ledahl

Paul Kroeger

Marc A. Fenster

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Erich Stuhlman

Attorney at Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP

1313 N. Market Street, Suite 5400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Samuel Lee Moultrie

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

The Nemours Building, 1007 North Orange Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Sara M. Skulman

Steven T. Margolin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

The Nemours Building, 1007 North Orange Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Howard E. Silverman

Benjamin J. Schladweiler

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

The Nemours Building, 1007 North Orange Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Herbert H. Finn

 

Court Documents

45 #2

Exhibit 2

45 #1

Exhibit 1

#45

(#45) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 6/27/2019 (lih). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

44 #1

[Proposed] Order

#44

(#44) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint - filed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 6/27/2019 (lih). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#43

(#43) RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Haivision Network Video Inc. re #41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Haivision Network Video Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solel . (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#41

(#41) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #23 MOTION to Dismiss. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/12/2018. (lih) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#23

(#41) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #23 MOTION to Dismiss. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/12/2018. (lih) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,934,535; 9,769,477; 8,929,442; 9,762,907; 7,386,046. (crb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Haivision KB Inc., Haivision Network Video Corp., Haivision Network Video Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2253384.) - filed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 6/27/2019 (lih). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint - filed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 6/27/2019 (lih). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Haivision Network Video Inc. re #41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Haivision Network Video Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solel . (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) OBJECTION to #41 Report and Recommendations by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 12/27/2018 (lih). (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #23 MOTION to Dismiss. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/12/2018. (lih) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Re: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul A. Kroeger for Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01519-CFC-SRF, 1:17-cv-01520-CFC-SRF, 1:17-cv-01692-CFC-SRF, 1:17-cv-01693-CFC-SRF(ceg) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • SO ORDERED- re (26 in 1:17-cv-01693-CFC-SRF, 43 in 1:17-cv-01692-CFC-SRF, 39 in 1:17-cv-01520-CFC-SRF, 39 in 1:17-cv-01519-CFC-SRF) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul A. Kroeger. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/5/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01519-CFC-SRF, 1:17-cv-01520-CFC-SRF, 1:17-cv-01692-CFC-SRF, 1:17-cv-01693-CFC-SRF(lih) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul A. Kroeger - filed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul A. Kroeger)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on October 2, 2018 before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2019. (bpg) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • ***NOTE: If the parties jointly consent to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynges jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this case, then the Pretrial Conference and Trial will be presided over by Judge Thynge consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be reassigned to a visiting District Judge, and any further dates in the Scheduling Order, including the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates, may be adjusted dependent on the availability of the visiting District Judge. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01519-VAC-MPT, 1:17-cv-01520-VAC-MPT(cak) (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC. Haivision KB Inc. served on 11/1/2017, answer due 11/22/2017. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC. Haivision Network Video Corp. served on 11/1/2017, answer due 11/22/2017. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC. Haivision Network Video Inc. served on 11/1/2017, answer due 11/22/2017. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01519-VAC, 1:17-cv-01520-VAC(bkb) (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01519-UNA, 1:17-cv-01520-UNA(bkb) (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Haivision KB Inc. on 10/26/2017; Haivision Network Video Corp. on 10/26/2017; Haivision Network Video Inc. on 10/26/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,934,535; 9,769,477; 8,929,442; 9,762,907; 7,386,046. (crb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Haivision KB Inc., Haivision Network Video Corp., Haivision Network Video Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2253384.) - filed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less