This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2018 at 08:01:20 (UTC).

Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC v. Apple INC.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2017 Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott T. Varholak and Marcia S. Krieger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-02869

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

Presiding Judge

Marcia S. Krieger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC

Defendant

Apple INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc Aaron Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Eric Bryan Fenster

Attorney at Eric B. Fenster, LLC

P.O. Box 44011

Denver, CO 80201

Brian David Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jay Young Chung

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Timothy T. Hsieh

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron Stafford Oakley

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP-Denver

1601 Wewatta Street, Suite 900

Denver, CO 80202

Clayton Cole James

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP-Denver

1601 Wewatta Street, Suite 900

Denver, CO 80202

Srecko Vidmar

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP-Denver

1601 Wewatta Street, Suite 900

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#25

#24

#22

21 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#21

#20

#19

#18

#5

#4

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER granting #25 Motion to Continue. The Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2018 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 3/12/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall submit a proposed protective order on or before 3/2/2018. The parties shall submit a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 3/5/2018. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/26/2018. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, ) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MEMORANDUM regarding #25 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Related Dates filed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/25/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Related Dates by Plaintiff Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Chung, Jay) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Chung, Jay) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Apple INC.: Defendant's answer due 3/5/18. Given the length of the extention requested, no further extensions will be granted. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/18/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (James, Clayton) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Apple INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(James, Clayton) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Aaron Stafford Oakley on behalf of Apple INC.Attorney Aaron Stafford Oakley added to party Apple INC.(pty:dft) (Oakley, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Srecko Vidmar on behalf of Apple INC.Attorney Srecko Vidmar added to party Apple INC.(pty:dft) (Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Clayton Cole James on behalf of Apple INC.Attorney Clayton Cole James added to party Apple INC.(pty:dft) (James, Clayton) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian David Ledahl on behalf of Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLCAttorney Brian David Ledahl added to party Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC(pty:pla) (Ledahl, Brian) (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 2/5/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/1/2017. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • (#8) ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/1/17. Text Only Entry (pglov) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Related Cases by Plaintiff Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC (Chung, Jay) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/30/17. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, ) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rroge, ) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • (#3) Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorneyEric B. Fenster, Marc A. Fenster.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rroge, ) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Apple INC. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5829110)Attorney Eric Bryan Fenster added to party Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fenster, Eric) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REALTIME ADAPTIVE STREAMING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Srecko Vidmar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron Stafford Oakley