This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/25/2018 at 06:49:23 (UTC).

Raymond v. Shue et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 Raymond filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Shue. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are P. K. Holmes, III and Mark E. Ford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02109

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes, III

Referral Judge

Mark E. Ford

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Leslie E. Raymond

Loretto, PA 15940

Respondents

Linda Ward

John/Jane Doe

Dan Shue

Denora D. Coomer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Pamela Anne Rumpz

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

323 Center Street Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201

Ashley Nicole Louks

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General

323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201

JaNan Arnold Davis

Attorney at Rainwater, Holt & Sexton, P.A.

Post Office Box 17250

Little Rock, AR 72222

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

10 #1

Brief In Support

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Dan Shue, Linda Ward. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support)Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(Rumpz, Pamela) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE by Denora D. Coomer re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus . (Davis, JaNan) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Nicole Louks on behalf of Dan Shue, Linda Ward. (Louks, Ashley) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Anne Rumpz on behalf of Dan Shue. (Rumpz, Pamela) Modified filer information on 7/17/2018 (mfr). (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #3 Order Directing Service. Linda Ward received documents on 6/29/18. (lw) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #3 Order Directing Service. Dan Shue received documents on 6/29/18. (lw) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #3 Order Directing Service. Cindy Gilmer received documents on 6/30/18 for Denora D. Coomer. (lw) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #3 Order Directing Service, #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus as to Linda Ward using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 9260. (hnc) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #3 Order Directing Service, #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus as to Dan Shue using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 9590. (hnc) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #3 Order Directing Service, #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus as to Denora D. Coomer using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 9613. (hnc) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE Dan Shue, Linda Ward, Denora Coomer (Circuit Court Clerk of Sebastian County, AR) and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 27, 2018. (hnc) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to Petitioner. (lw) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Mandamus against John/Jane Doe(Sebastian County Deputy Court Clerk), John/Jane Doe(Sebastian County Court Clerk), Dan Shue, Linda Ward, filed by Leslie E. Raymond.(lw) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pamela Rumpz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JaNan Arnold Davis