This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2020 at 06:04:49 (UTC).

Ray v. Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 Ray filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert E. Blackburn, Scott T. Varholak and Raymond P. Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03299

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

Presiding Judges

Robert E. Blackburn

Raymond P. Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Ray

Defendants

Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc.

John Doe

Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc. and John Doe doing business as Nabors Drilling USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lane Nathan Cohen

Defendant Attorneys

Elliot Reaven

Michael D. Plachy

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#7

#6

#5

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lane Nathan Cohen on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Lane Nathan Cohen added to party Daniel Ray(pty:pla) (Cohen, Lane) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/29/19. (morti, ) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/29/2019. Discovery due by 7/29/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: STV - 402. (morti, ) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc.. (Plachy, Michael) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Reaven, Elliot) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael D. Plachy on behalf of Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc.Attorney Michael D. Plachy added to party Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (Plachy, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc..(Reaven, Elliot) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/28/18 Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. On or before January 22, 2019, the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order in the form required pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the operative complaint is extended until 1/10/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/28/2018. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM regarding #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #6 Complaint filed by Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/28/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #6 Complaint by Defendant Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reaven, Elliot) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • (#9) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/27/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • (#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/27/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03299-RM. (athom, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) COMPLAINT against John Doe, Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc., filed by Daniel Ray.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • (#4) Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • (#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • (#2) Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc. d/b/a Nabors Drilling USA from District Court, Weld County, State of Colorado, Case Number 18CV31052. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6453373), filed by Nabors Drilling Technology USA, Inc. d/b/a Nabors Drilling USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reaven, Elliot) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less